EP3219807 - IMPROVED SPACER MEMBRANE FOR AN ENZYMATIC IN-VIVO SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstraße 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAIB, Arnulf Silvanerweg 4 64646 Heppenheim / DE | 02 /
THIELE, Marcel Mannheimer Str. 95 68309 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
KOELKER, Karl-Heinz Triftweg 31 67269 Grünstadt / DE | 04 /
RIEGER, Ewald Littersheimer Weg 10 67240 Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE | 05 /
LICHT, Alexander Horazweg 18 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2017/38] | Application number, filing date | 17169444.1 | 27.03.2013 | [2017/38] | Priority number, date | WO2012EP55406 | 27.03.2012 Original published format: PCT/EP2012/055406 | [2017/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3219807 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3219807 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
C12Q1/002 (EP);
C12Q1/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE ABSTANDSHALTERMEMBRAN FÜR EINEN ENZYMATISCHEN IN-VIVO-SENSOR | [2017/38] | English: | IMPROVED SPACER MEMBRANE FOR AN ENZYMATIC IN-VIVO SENSOR | [2017/38] | French: | MEMBRANE D ́ESPACEMENT AMÉLIORÉ POUR UN CAPTEUR ENZYMATIQUE IN VIVO | [2017/38] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/38] | 04.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.07.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.09.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 27.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13712795.7 / EP2831263 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2013 | AL | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | HR | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | MK | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | RS | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | SM | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | BG | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | IE | 27.03.2019 | LU | 27.03.2019 | MT | 27.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 27.03.2013 | |
AL | 14.11.2018 | ||
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2006058779 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-19 * page 6 - page 9, paragraph 36; claim - *; | [AD]WO2007147475 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-19* page 8 - page 10 *; | [A]EP2163190 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050]; figure -; example -; claim - *; | [A] - MANG A ET AL, "Biocompatibility of an electrochemical sensor for continuous glucose monitoring in subcutaneous tissue", DIABETES TECHNOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, MARY ANN LIEBERT, LARCHMONT, NY, US, (20050201), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1089/DIA.2005.7.163, ISSN 1520-9156, pages 163 - 173, XP002446481 [A] 1-19 * page 164 - page 168; figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/dia.2005.7.163 | [A] - UCHIYAMA T ET AL, "Biocompatible polymer alloy membrane for implantable artificial pancreas", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBL.COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20021001), vol. 208, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0376-7388(02)00137-0, ISSN 0376-7388, pages 39 - 48, XP004380080 [A] 1-19 * page 40 - page 43; figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0376-7388(02)00137-0 | [AP] - YAN WANG ET AL, "Polymeric "smart" coatings to prevent foreign body response to implantable biosensors", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (20130105), doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2012.12.028, ISSN 0168-3659, XP055061963 [AP] 1-19 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2012.12.028 | [A] - JACQUELINE M. MORAIS ET AL, "Biomaterials/Tissue Interactions: Possible Solutions to Overcome Foreign Body Response", THE AAPS JOURNAL, (201006), vol. 12, no. 2, doi:10.1208/s12248-010-9175-3, ISSN 1550-7416, pages 188 - 196, XP055061980 [A] 1-19 * page 190 - page 192; tables II-IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1208/s12248-010-9175-3 | [A] - Anonymous, "Adapt TM Biostable Drug Delivery Platform", (20120105), page 1, BioInteractions, URL: http://www.biointeractions.com/pdfs/adapt_overview.pdf, (20130507), XP002696778 [A] 1-19 * page 1 * | [A] - ALI OZGUR BOZTAS ET AL, "Immobilization and Release of the Redox Mediator Ferrocene Monocarboxylic Acid from within Cross-Linked p(HEMA- co -PEGMA- co -HMMA) Hydrogels", BIOMACROMOLECULES, (20090810), vol. 10, no. 8, doi:10.1021/bm900299b, ISSN 1525-7797, pages 2135 - 2143, XP055062479 [A] 1-19 * page 2135 - page 2136; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bm900299b | [A] - ABRAHAM S ET AL, "Molecularly engineered p(HEMA)-based hydrogels for implant biochip biocompatibility", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 26, no. 23, ISSN 0142-9612, (20050801), pages 4767 - 4778, (20050801), XP027768280 [A] 1-19 * page 4768 - page 4770; table 1 * | by applicant | WO2006058779 | WO2007147475 | EP2163190 | WO2010028708 | - BOKER ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (2001), vol. 34, pages 7477 - 7488 |