EP3301888 - CALL PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CALL NOTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2018/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Ruixian Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District, Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
ZOU, Yixing Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District, Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Shuo Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District, Beijing 100085 / CN | [2018/14] | Representative(s) | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2018/14] | Application number, filing date | 17169592.7 | 04.05.2017 | [2018/14] | Priority number, date | CN201610866956 | 29.09.2016 Original published format: CN201610866956 | [2018/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3301888 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/57 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
H04M1/575 (EP,US);
H04M1/27453 (CN);
G06F3/04847 (US);
H04M1/72403 (EP,CN,US);
H04M1/72484 (CN);
H04M3/42059 (US);
H04M3/436 (US);
H04M2203/551 (US);
H04M2250/60 (EP,US);
H04M2250/68 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANRUFVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR ANRUFNOTIZEN | [2018/14] | English: | CALL PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CALL NOTES | [2018/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'APPELS POUR NOTES D'APPEL | [2018/14] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/13] | 08.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6088696 (MOON BILLY G [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 1, line 49 - line 53 * * column 2, line 50 - line 61 ** column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 37; figures 11-12 *; | [X]EP2309710 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US2014211791 (CADIZ JONATHAN JAY [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0140]; figures 9-10 *; | [X]US2014315525 (KIM HAN-JIB [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0099]; figures 1-8 * |