EP3260995 - CLUSTERING LAYERS IN MULTI-NODE CLUSTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EntIT Software LLC 1140 Enterprise Way, Building G Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Christopher 3404 E. Harmony Road Fort Collins, Colorado 80528-9544 / US | 02 /
CHIU WAI TSANG, Arthur 1140 Enterprise Way Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/52] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17170266.5 | 09.05.2017 | [2017/52] | Priority number, date | US201615188312 | 21.06.2016 Original published format: US201615188312 | [2017/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3260995 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
G06F16/278 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (US);
G06F16/22 (EP,US);
G06F16/2379 (EP,US);
H04L41/12 (US);
H04L47/125 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CLUSTERING SCHICHTEN IN MULTI-NODE-CLUSTER | [2017/52] | English: | CLUSTERING LAYERS IN MULTI-NODE CLUSTERS | [2017/52] | French: | COUCHES DE REGROUPEMENT EN GRAPPES MULTINOEUD | [2017/52] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2012246202 (SURTANI MANIK [GB], et al) [I] 1,4-15,17 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0114] * [Y] 2,3,16,18-20; | [YA] - Voltdb, "Using VoltDB", (20160115), URL: http://downloads.voltdb.com/documentation/v5docs/UsingVoltDB.pdf, (20170628), XP055385909 [Y] 2,3,16,18-20 * Section 1.3 * * Section 9.2.1 * * Section 9.2.2 * [A] 1,4-15,17 |