EP3404420 - LABORATORY INSTRUMENT, LABORATORY INSTRUMENT NETWORK AND METHOD FOR WORKING ON LABORATORY SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eppendorf SE Barkhausenweg 1 22339 Hamburg / DE | [2023/17] |
Former [2018/47] | For all designated states Eppendorf AG Barkhausenweg 1 22339 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BULLER, Steffen Barkhausenweg 1 22339 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
THIEME, Andreas Barkhausenweg 1 22339 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
WILD, Michael Barkhausenweg 1 22339 Hamburg / DE | [2018/47] | Representative(s) | Kirchner, Christian Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5 - 7 80331 München / DE | [2018/47] | Application number, filing date | 17171128.6 | 15.05.2017 | [2018/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3404420 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00, B01L1/00, // B01L7/00, B01L9/00 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
G01N35/00 (EP,US);
B01L1/00 (EP,US);
G01N35/00871 (US);
B01L2200/147 (EP);
B01L2200/18 (EP);
B01L2300/023 (EP);
B01L2300/0829 (EP);
B01L7/00 (EP);
B01L9/523 (EP);
G01N2035/00881 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/47] | G01N35/00, B01L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] |
Former [2018/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LABORINSTRUMENT, LABORINSTRUMENTENNETZWERK UND VERFAHREN ZUR ARBEIT AN LABORPROBEN | [2018/47] | English: | LABORATORY INSTRUMENT, LABORATORY INSTRUMENT NETWORK AND METHOD FOR WORKING ON LABORATORY SAMPLES | [2018/47] | French: | INSTRUMENT DE LABORATOIRE, RÉSEAU D'INSTRUMENTS DE LABORATOIRE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR TRAVAILLER SUR DES ÉCHANTILLONS DE LABORATOIRE | [2018/47] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 21.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9411838 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 1-16 * figure 1 * * page 11 *; | [XI]US2002090320 (BUROW KRISTINA MARIE [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,10,12,16 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0135] * * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0140] * * paragraph [0145] * [I] 2,7-9,11,13-15; | [XI]US2003215357 (MALTERER NIGEL [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,14,16 * figures 1-6,16-17 * * paragraphs [0040] , [0043] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraphs [0076] , [0082] , [0087] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0102] * [I] 7,13,15; | [A]US2006283944 (HOLLEY CHARLES [US]) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-3,7 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] *; | [A]US2007237675 (NICHOLS MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-16* abstract * |