EP3246169 - THERMAL PRINTER AND PORTABLE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [2017/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDO, Norihisa c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [2017/47] | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [2017/47] | Application number, filing date | 17171329.0 | 16.05.2017 | [2017/47] | Priority number, date | JP20160098105 | 16.05.2016 Original published format: JP 2016098105 | [2017/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3246169 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/32, B41J2/325, B41J29/02, B41J29/38 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
B41J29/02 (EP,US);
B41J2/32 (EP,CN,US);
B41J11/04 (US);
B41J2/325 (EP,US);
B41J29/38 (EP,US);
B41J3/36 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] |
Former [2017/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMODRUCKER UND TRAGBARES ENDGERÄT | [2017/47] | English: | THERMAL PRINTER AND PORTABLE TERMINAL | [2017/47] | French: | IMPRIMANTE THERMIQUE ET TERMINAL PORTABLE | [2017/47] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 29.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/49] | 17.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1338423 (SII P & S INC [JP]) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0032] * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2005090086 (BEMATECH IND E COM DE EQUIPAME [BR], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * figure 7 *; | [A]EP1719628 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP2537680 (FUJITSU COMPONENT LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0024] * * figure - *; | [A]US2016059588 (AIZAWA KAZUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0096] * * figure 13 *; | [A]US2010245522 (MIYASHITA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1,2 * |