EP3249564 - MASSAGE MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Family Inada Co., Ltd. 14th floor SORA Shin-Osaka 21 2-1-3 Nishimiyahara Yodogawa-ku Osaka, Osaka 532-0004 / JP | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INADA, Nichimu c/o Family Inada Co., Ltd., 14th floor SORA Shin-Osaka 21 2-1-3 Nishimiyahara, Yodogawa-ku Osaka, Osaka 532-0004 / JP | 02 /
ISHIDOU, Yuta c/o Daisen Factory of Family Inada Co., Ltd. 1220, Takada, Daisen-cho Saihaku-gun, Tottori 689-3224 / JP | 03 /
NOTSU, Yuji c/o Daisen Factory of Family Inada Co., Ltd. 1220, Takada, Daisen-cho Saihaku-gun, Tottori 689-3224 / JP | 04 /
SASAKI, Izumi c/o Daisen Factory of Family Inada Co., Ltd. 1220, Takada, Daisen-cho Saihaku-gun, Tottori 689-3224 / JP | [2017/48] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/48] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17171585.7 | 17.05.2017 | [2017/48] | Priority number, date | JP20160105696 | 26.05.2016 Original published format: JP 2016105696 | [2017/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3249564 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, // A61H15/00 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
G16H20/30 (EP,US);
A61H7/007 (KR);
A61H7/00 (CN);
A61H23/006 (KR);
A61H23/02 (KR,US);
A61H37/00 (KR);
A61H7/004 (KR);
A61M21/02 (US);
A61H2015/0014 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0149 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61H2201/1623 (EP,US);
A61H2201/164 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1669 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5023 (CN);
A61H2201/5038 (KR);
A61H2201/5041 (KR);
A61H2201/5043 (CN,KR);
A61H2205/081 (EP,US);
A61H2205/10 (EP,US);
A61H23/0254 (US);
A61M2021/0022 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASSAGEMASCHINE | [2017/48] | English: | MASSAGE MACHINE | [2017/48] | French: | MACHINE DE MASSAGE | [2017/48] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/47] | 06.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN1154236 (LIU AOYU [CN]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [XI]US6123661 (FUKUSHIMA SHOGO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * column 1, line 1 - column 6, line 64 * * column 8, line 17 - line 49 * * column 11, line 40 - line 42 * * column 13, line 53 - column 14, line 10 * * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 5, 10A, 10B; table 1 * [I] 2,3,5,7; | [A]EP1350502 (FAMILY CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * column 1, paragraph 0001 - column 3, paragraph 0017 * * column 18, paragraph 0088; figures 8,9 * * column 32, paragraph 0138 - column 33, paragraph 0144; figures 23,24 * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | JP3363313B |