EP3252372 - LUMINAIRE OF A RAILWAY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seisenbacher GmbH Schwarzenberg 82 3341 Ybbsitz / AT | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENTNER, Reinhard Feldholzstr. 2 3304 ST. GEORGEN AM YBBSFELDE / AT | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | Babeluk, Michael Florianigasse 26/3 1080 Wien / AT | [2017/49] | Application number, filing date | 17172112.9 | 22.05.2017 | [2017/49] | Priority number, date | AT20160050090U | 31.05.2016 Original published format: AT 5009016 U | [2017/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3252372 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F21V17/16, B61D29/00, F21V21/02, F21V23/06, F21S4/28, B60Q3/43, // F21Y103/10, F21W101/08 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
F21S4/28 (EP,US);
B60Q3/43 (EP,AT);
B60Q3/51 (EP);
B61D29/00 (EP,AT);
F21K9/00 (AT);
F21S4/20 (AT);
F21V17/164 (EP);
F21V21/025 (EP);
F21V23/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEUCHTE EINES SCHIENENFAHRZEUGES | [2017/49] | English: | LUMINAIRE OF A RAILWAY VEHICLE | [2017/49] | French: | ÉCLAIRAGE D'UN VÉHICULE SUR RAILS | [2017/49] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/51] | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5222799 (SEARS LAWRENCE A [CA], et al) [I] 1-3,6,8,11,12 * figures 2, 4a, 4c * * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 44 *; | [I]US2010226125 (LIAO WEN-YUAN [TW], et al) [I] 1-3,7 * figures 1A-3C ** paragraphs [0040] - [0058] *; | [XI]US2012182747 (DOUBEK DAVID E [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * figures 10, 13, 14, 16, 17 * * paragraphs [0083] - [0090] * [I] 6,7,11,12; | [XYI]DE202012102874U (SCHUECO INT KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,11,12 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0 20] - [0029] - [0 32] * [Y] 8-10 [I] 6; | [XI]DE202012103264U (ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-4,7,11,13-15 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0020] , [0 24] - [0029] * [I] 12; | [Y]WO2015121013 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 8-10 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 13 * |