EP3255244 - TANDEM BLADE AND CORRESPONDING GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/50] | TANDEM TIP BLADES AND CORRESPONDING GAS TURBINE ENGINE | ||
[2021/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2017/50] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOYTOVYCH, Dmytro Mykolayovych 177 New Britain Avenue Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | 02 /
STAROSELSKY, Alexander 80 Fox Hollow Avon, CT 06001 / US | 03 /
GRAY, Eric D. 350 Great Swamp Road Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/38] |
Former [2017/50] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17172283.8 | 22.05.2017 | [2017/50] | Priority number, date | US201615160165 | 20.05.2016 Original published format: US201615160165 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3255244 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3255244 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, // F01D5/22 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
F01D5/146 (EP,US);
F04D29/324 (US);
F02C3/04 (US);
F02K3/06 (US);
F04D29/384 (US);
F01D5/225 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2017/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TANDEM-LAUFSCHAUFEL UND ZUGEHÖRIGES GASTURBINENTRIEBWERK | [2021/10] | English: | TANDEM BLADE AND CORRESPONDING GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2021/10] | French: | AUBES ROTORIQUES TANDEM ET MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ ASSOCIÉ | [2021/10] |
Former [2017/50] | LAUFSCHAUFEL MIT TANDEMSPITZE UND ZUGEHÖRIGES GASTURBINENTRIEBWERK | ||
Former [2017/50] | TANDEM TIP BLADES AND CORRESPONDING GAS TURBINE ENGINE | ||
Former [2017/50] | AUBES ROTORIQUES À BOUT EN TANDEM ET MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ ASSOCIÉ | Examination procedure | 22.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 23.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2017 | AL | 22.09.2021 | AT | 22.09.2021 | CY | 22.09.2021 | CZ | 22.09.2021 | DK | 22.09.2021 | EE | 22.09.2021 | ES | 22.09.2021 | FI | 22.09.2021 | HR | 22.09.2021 | IT | 22.09.2021 | LT | 22.09.2021 | LV | 22.09.2021 | MC | 22.09.2021 | MK | 22.09.2021 | NL | 22.09.2021 | PL | 22.09.2021 | RO | 22.09.2021 | RS | 22.09.2021 | SE | 22.09.2021 | SI | 22.09.2021 | SK | 22.09.2021 | SM | 22.09.2021 | TR | 22.09.2021 | BG | 22.12.2021 | NO | 22.12.2021 | GR | 23.12.2021 | IS | 22.01.2022 | PT | 24.01.2022 | IE | 22.05.2022 | LU | 22.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 22.05.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
MK | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
SM | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 22.05.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 22.05.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
SM | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 22.05.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 22.05.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 22.05.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.05.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 22.05.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 22.05.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 22.05.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 22.09.2021 | |
NO | 22.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU1758247 (LE I KORABLE STR [SU]) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,10,12-15 * figure - *; | [X]JPH07279887 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,10,12-15 * figure - *; | [X]WO2005040559 (PIETRICOLA PAOLO [IT]) [X] 1-15 * figures 5a-5f, 11c *; | [X]CN103953579 (INST ENG THERMOPHYSICS CAS) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,10,12-15* figure 1 *; | [X]WO2015072256 (IHI CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * figure - * |