EP3248798 - RECORDING APPARATUS AND RECORDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARA, Osamu c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
WASHIZAWA, Takehito c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
KONISHI, Yoshiyuki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2017/48] | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [2017/48] | Application number, filing date | 17172446.1 | 23.05.2017 | [2017/48] | Priority number, date | JP20160102169 | 23.05.2016 Original published format: JP 2016102169 | [2017/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3248798 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3248798 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B41J11/00 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
B41J11/0015 (EP,US);
B41J2/01 (CN);
B41J11/42 (US);
B41J2/04541 (US);
B41J2/08 (US);
B41J2/145 (US);
B41J2/47 (US);
B41J29/38 (US);
B41J11/0024 (EP,US);
B41J11/00244 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] |
Former [2017/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND AUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/48] | English: | RECORDING APPARATUS AND RECORDING METHOD | [2017/48] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2017/48] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 16.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.05.2017 | AL | 25.12.2019 | AT | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | ES | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | IT | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | NL | 25.12.2019 | PL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | RS | 25.12.2019 | SE | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | TR | 25.12.2019 | BG | 25.03.2020 | NO | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | IE | 23.05.2020 | LU | 23.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.05.2017 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 23.05.2020 | ||
LU | 23.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 23.05.2020 | ||
LU | 23.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 23.05.2020 | ||
LU | 23.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 23.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 25.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006068281 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 11, line 22 - page 33, line 15; figures 1-11 *; | [X]US2011102490 (YAMADA YOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0107]; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US2012287208 (KOBASHI MASARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraphs [0008] , [0011] , [0042] - [0079]; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US2015375532 (TOKAI YOSHITSUGU [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0084]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP2979876 (OKI DATA INFOTECH CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6* paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | JP2015024648 |