EP3406719 - CALCINEURIN B HOMOLOGOUS PROTEIN 1 INHIBITORS AND THERAPEUTIC AND NON-THERAPEUTIC USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität zu Köln Albertus-Magnus-Platz 50923 Köln / DE | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wirth, Brunhilde Heinrich-Heine-Str. 46 53225 Bonn / DE | 02 /
Janzen, Eva Wilhelm Bachhausstr. 23 50931 Köln / DE | 03 /
Mendoza-Ferreira, Natalia Komödienstr. 48 50667 Köln / DE | 04 /
Hosseinibarkooie, Seyyedmohsen Kapuzinerstr. 2 50737 Köln / DE | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | Lahrtz, Fritz Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/48] | Lahrtz, Fritz Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17172826.4 | 24.05.2017 | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3406719 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/7088 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP);
A61K31/713 (EP);
C12N2310/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN VON HOMOLOGEM CALCINEURIN-B-PROTEIN 1 UND THERAPEUTISCHE UND NICHTTHERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2018/48] | English: | CALCINEURIN B HOMOLOGOUS PROTEIN 1 INHIBITORS AND THERAPEUTIC AND NON-THERAPEUTIC USES THEREOF | [2018/48] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE LA PROTÉINE 1 HOMOLOGUE DE CALCINEURINE B ET LEURS UTILISATIONS THÉRAPEUTIQUES ET NON THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2018/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | 13.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015014838 (UNIVERSITÄT ZU KÖLN [DE]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-15 *; | [A]WO2015035460 (UNIV WESTERN AUSTRALIA [AU]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0011]; claims 1, 10, 19 *; | [A] - LIN X ET AL, "Inhibition of calcineurin phosphatase activity by a calcineurin B homologous protein", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (19991217), vol. 274, no. 51, doi:10.1074/JBC.274.51.36125, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 36125 - 36131, XP002213293 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.51.36125 | [A] - LIU J O ED - ANDREWS PETER W ET AL, "Endogenous protein inhibitors of calcineurin", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICAT, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20031128), vol. 311, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2003.10.020, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 1103 - 1109, XP004472284 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2003.10.020 | by applicant | - ACKERMANN, B.; S. KROBER; L. TORRES-BENITO; A. BORGMANN; M. PETERS; S.M. HOSSEINI BARKOOIE; R. TEJERO; M. JAKUBIK; J. SCHREML; J., "Plastin 3 ameliorates spinal muscular atrophy via delayed axon pruning and improves neuromuscular junction functionality", HUM MOL GENET., (2013), vol. 22, pages 1328 - 1347 | - ANDRADE, J.; H. ZHAO; B. TITUS; S. TIMM PEARCE; M. BARROSO., "The EF-hand Ca2+-binding protein p22 plays a role in microtubule and endoplasmic reticulum organization and dynamics with distinct Ca2+-binding requirements", MOL BIOL CELL, (2004), vol. 15, pages 481 - 496 | - BARROSO, M.R.; K.K. BERND; N.D. DEWITT; A. CHANG; K. MILLS; E.S. SZTUL., "A novel Ca2+-binding protein, p22, is required for constitutive membrane traffic", J BIOL CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, pages 10183 - 10187 | - BAUMGARTEL, K.; I.M. MANSUY, "Neural functions of calcineurin in synaptic plasticity and memory", LEARN MEM., (2012), vol. 19, pages 375 - 384 | - BODMER, D.; M. ASCANO; R. KURUVILLA, "Isoform-specific dephosphorylation of dynaminl by calcineurin couples neurotrophin receptor endocytosis to axonal growth", NEURON, (2011), vol. 70, doi:doi:10.1016/j.neuron.2011.04.025, pages 1085 - 1099, XP028379652 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuron.2011.04.025 | - CLAYTON, E.L.; V. ANGGONO; K.J. SMILLIE; N. CHAU; P.J. ROBINSON; M.A. COUSIN, "The phospho-dependent dynamin-syndapin interaction triggers activity-dependent bulk endocytosis of synaptic vesicles", JNEUROSCI., (2009), vol. 29, pages 7706 - 7717 | - COOPER, J.D.; A. SALEHI; J.D. DELCROIX; C.L. HOWE; P.V. BELICHENKO; J. CHUA-COUZENS; J.F. KILBRIDGE; E.J. CARLSON; C.J. EPSTEIN; W, "Failed retrograde transport of NGF in a mouse model of Down's syndrome: reversal of cholinergic neurodegenerative phenotypes following NGF infusion", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 10439 - 10444 | - COUSIN, M.A.; P.J. ROBINSON, "The dephosphins: dephosphorylation by calcineurin triggers synaptic vesicle endocytosis", TRENDS IN NEUROSCIENCES., (2001), vol. 24, doi:doi:10.1016/S0166-2236(00)01930-5, pages 659 - 665, XP004321959 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-2236(00)01930-5 | - CROWE, J.; B.S. MASONE; J. RIBBE, "One-step purification of recombinant proteins with the 6xHis tag and Ni-NTA resin", MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY., (1995), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1007/BF02779018, pages 247 - 258, XP002048291 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02779018 | - D'YDEWALLE, C.; D.M. RAMOS; N.J. PYLES; S.Y. NG; M. GORZ; C.M. PILATO; K. LING; L. KONG; A.J. WARD; L.L. RUBIN, "The Antisense Transcript SMN-AS1 Regulates SMN Expression and Is a Novel Therapeutic Target for Spinal Muscular Atrophy", NEURON, (2017), vol. 93, pages 66 - 79 | - DI SOLE, F.; K. VADNAGARA; O.W. MOE; V. BABICH, "Calcineurin homologous protein: a multifunctional Ca2+-binding protein family", AM J PHYSIOL RENAL PHYSIOL., (2012), vol. 303, pages F 165 - 179 | - DIMITRIADI, M.; J.N. SLEIGH; A. WALKER; H.C. CHANG; A. SEN; G. KALLOO; J. HARRIS; T. BARSBY; M.B. WALSH; J.S. SATTERLEE, "Conserved genes act as modifiers of invertebrate SMN loss of function defects", PLOS GENET., (2010), vol. 6, page E1001172 | - ERMAK, G.; T.E. MORGAN; K.J. DAVIES, "Chronic overexpression of the calcineurin inhibitory gene DSCR1 (Adapt78) is associated with Alzheimer's disease", J BIOL CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M102829200, pages 38787 - 38794, XP002969146 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M102829200 | - EVANS, G.J.; M.A. COUSIN, "Activity-dependent control of slow synaptic vesicle endocytosis by cyclin-dependent kinase 5", JNEUROSCI., (2007), vol. 27, pages 401 - 411 | - FELDKOTTER, M.; V. SCHWARZER; R. WIRTH; T.F. WIENKER; B. WIRTH, "Quantitative analyses of SMN1 and SMN2 based on real-time lightCycler PCR: fast and highly reliable carrier testing and prediction of severity of spinal muscular atrophy", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, (2002), vol. 70, pages 358 - 368 | - FLANAGAN-STEET, H; M.A. FOX; D. MEYER; J.R. SANES, "Neuromuscular synapses can form in vivo by incorporation of initially aneural postsynaptic specializations", DEVELOPMENT, (2005), vol. 132, pages 4471 - 4481 | - HOSSEINIBARKOOIE, S.; M. PETERS; L. TORRES-BENITO; R.H. RASTETTER; K. HUPPERICH; A. HOFFMANN; N. MENDOZA-FERREIRA; A. KACZMAREK; E, "The Power of Human Protective Modifiers: PLS3 and COROIC Unravel Impaired Endocytosis in Spinal Muscular Atrophy and Rescue SMA Phenotype", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, (2016), vol. 99, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ajhg.2016.07.014, pages 647 - 665, XP029711784 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ajhg.2016.07.014 | - HSIEH-LI, H.M.; J.G. CHANG; Y.J. JONG; M.H. WU; N.M. WANG; C.H. TSAI; H. LI, "A mouse model for spinal muscular atrophy", NAT GENET., (2000), vol. 24, doi:doi:10.1038/71709, pages 66 - 70, XP002153156 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/71709 | - HUA, Y.; K. SAHASHI; F. RIGO; G. HUNG; G. HOREV; C.F. BENNETT; A.R. KRAINER, "Peripheral SMN restoration is essential for long-term rescue of a severe spinal muscular atrophy mouse model", NATURE, (2011), vol. 478, doi:doi:10.1038/nature10485, pages 123 - 126, XP055038358 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature10485 | - JIMENEZ-VIDAL, M.; J. SRIVASTAVA; L.K. PUTNEY; D.L. BARBER, "Nuclear-localized calcineurin homologous protein CHP1 interacts with upstream binding factor and inhibits ribosomal RNA synthesis", JBIOL CHEM., (2010), vol. 285, pages 36260 - 36266 | - KAIFER, K.A.; E. VILLALON; E.Y. OSMAN; J.J. GLASCOCK; L.L. ARNOLD; D.D. CORNELISON; C.L. LORSON., "Plastin-3 extends survival and reduces severity in mouse models of spinal muscular atrophy", JCI INSIGHT., (2017), vol. 2, page E89970 | - KUBLER, E.; H. RIEZMAN, "Actin and fimbrin are required for the internalization step of endocytosis in yeast", EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 2855 - 2862 | - KUWAHARA, H.; J. KAMEI; N. NAKAMURA; M. MATSUMOTO; H. INOUE; H. KANAZAWA, "The apoptosis-inducing protein kinase DRAK2 is inhibited in a calcium-dependent manner by the calcium-binding protein CHP", JBIOCHEM., (2003), vol. 134, pages 245 - 250 | - LADNER, C.J.; J. CZECH; J. MAURICE; S.A. LORENS; J.M. LEE, "Reduction of calcineurin enzymatic activity in Alzheimer's disease: correlation with neuropathologic changes", JOURNAL OF NEUROPATHOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, (1996), vol. 55, pages 924 - 931 | - LE ROY, C.; J.L. WRANA, "Clathrin- and non-clathrin-mediated endocytic regulation of cell signalling", NAT REV MOL CELL BIOL., (2005), vol. 6, pages 112 - 126 | - LEFEBVRE, S.; L. BURGLEN; S. REBOULLET; O. CLERMONT; P. BURLET; L. VIOLLET; B. BENICHOU; C. CRUAUD; P. MILLASSEAU; M. ZEVIANI ET A, "Identification and characterization of a spinal muscular atrophy-determining gene", CELL, (1995), vol. 80, pages 155 - 165 | - LIN, X.; R.A. SIKKINK; F. RUSNAK; D.L. BARBER, "Inhibition of calcineurin phosphatase activity by a calcineurin B homologous protein", J BIOL CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.274.51.36125, pages 36125 - 36131, XP002213293 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.51.36125 | - LIU, J.; J.D. FARMER, JR.; W.S. LANE; J. FRIEDMAN; I. WEISSMAN; S.L. SCHREIBER, "Calcineurin is a common target of cyclophilin-cyclosporin A and FKBP-FK506 complexes", CELL, (1991), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(91)90124-H, pages 807 - 815, XP027461712 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(91)90124-H | - LIU, J.O., "Endogenous protein inhibitors of calcineurin", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (2003), vol. 311, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bbrc.2003.10.020, pages 1103 - 1109, XP004472284 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2003.10.020 | - LIU, J.P.; A.T. SIM; P.J. ROBINSON, "Calcineurin inhibition of dynamin I GTPase activity coupled to nerve terminal depolarization", SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 265, pages 970 - 973 | - LIU, Y.; H.C. ZAUN; J. ORLOWSKI; S.L. ACKERMAN, "CHPl-mediated NHE1 biosynthetic maturation is required for Purkinje cell axon homeostasis", J NEUROSCI., (2013), vol. 33, pages 12656 - 12669 | - MILLER, N.; Z. FENG; B.M. EDENS; B. YANG; H. SHI; C.C. SZE; B.T. HONG; S.C. SU; J.A. CANTU; J. TOPCZEWSKI, "Non-aggregating tau phosphorylation by cyclin-dependent kinase 5 contributes to motor neuron degeneration in spinal muscular atrophy", J NEUROSCI., (2015), vol. 35, pages 6038 - 6050 | - MURRAY, L.M.; L.H. COMLEY; D. THOMSON; N. PARKINSON; K. TALBOT; T.H. GILLINGWATER., "Selective vulnerability of motor neurons and dissociation of pre- and postsynaptic pathology at the neuromuscular junction in mouse models of spinal muscular atrophy", HUM MOL GENET., (2008), vol. 17, pages 949 - 962 | - NARYSHKIN, N.A.; M. WEETALL; A. DAKKA; J. NARASIMHAN; X. ZHAO; Z. FENG; K.K. LING; G.M. KARP; H. QI; M.G. WOLL, "Motor neuron disease. SMN2 splicing modifiers improve motor function and longevity in mice with spinal muscular atrophy", SCIENCE, (2014), vol. 345, pages 688 - 693 | - NOLLE, A.; A. ZEUG; J. VAN BERGEIJK; L. TONGES; R. GERHARD; H. BRINKMANN; S. A1 RAYES; N. HENSEL; Y. SCHILL; D. APKHAZAVA, "The spinal muscular atrophy disease protein SMN is linked to the Rho-kinase pathway via profilin", HUM MOL GENET, (2011), vol. 20, pages 4865 - 4878 | - OPREA, G.E.; S. KROBER; M.L. MCWHORTER; W. ROSSOLL; S. MULLER; M. KRAWCZAK; G.J. BASSELL; C.E. BEATTIE; B. WIRTH, "Plastin 3 is a protective modifier of autosomal recessive spinal muscular atrophy", SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 320, pages 524 - 527 | - PALACINO, J.; S.E. SWALLEY; C. SONG; A.K. CHEUNG; L. SHU; X. ZHANG; M. VAN HOOSEAR; Y. SHIN; D.N. CHIN; C.G. KELLER, "SMN2 splice modulators enhance Ul-pre-mRNA association and rescue SMA mice", NATURE CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (2015), vol. 11, pages 511 - 517 | - RIESSLAND, M.; B. ACKERMANN; A. FORSTER; M. JAKUBIK; J. HAUKE; L. GARBES; I. FRITZSCHE; Y. MENDE; I. BLUMCKE; E. HAHNEN, "SAHA ameliorates the SMA phenotype in two mouse models for spinal muscular atrophy", HUM MOL GENET., (2010), vol. 19, pages 1492 - 1506 | - RIESSLAND, M.; A. KACZMAREK; S. SCHNEIDER; K.J. SWOBODA; H. LOHR; C. BRADLER; V. GRYSKO; M. DIMITRIADI; S. HOSSEINIBARKOOIE; L. TO, "Neurocalcin Delta Suppression Protects against Spinal Muscular Atrophy in Humans and across Species by Restoring Impaired Endocytosis", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, (2017), vol. 100, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ajhg.2017.01.005, pages 297 - 315, XP029905981 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ajhg.2017.01.005 | - ROBERTS, B.; J. POHL; J.L. GOOCH, "A fluorimetric method for determination of calcineurin activity", CELL CALCIUM, (2008), vol. 43, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ceca.2007.08.004, pages 515 - 519, XP022617112 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ceca.2007.08.004 | - SCHREIJ, A.M.; E.A. FON; P.S. MCPHERSON, "Endocytic membrane trafficking and neurodegenerative disease", CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR LIFE SCIENCES : CMLS, (2016), vol. 73, doi:doi:10.1007/s00018-015-2105-x, pages 1529 - 1545, XP035801845 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00018-015-2105-x | - SMILLIE, K.J.; M.A. COUSIN, "Akt/PKB controls the activity-dependent bulk endocytosis of synaptic vesicles", TRAFFIC, (2012), vol. 13, pages 1004 - 1011 | - SMITH, D.B.; K.S. JOHNSON, "Single-step purification of polypeptides expressed in Escherichia coli as fusions with glutathione S-transferase", GENE, (1988), vol. 67, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-1119(88)90005-4, pages 31 - 40, XP023544179 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(88)90005-4 | - TIMM, S.; B. TITUS; K. BERND; M. BARROSO, "The EF-hand Ca(2+)-binding protein p22 associates with microtubules in an N-myristoylation-dependent manner", MOL BIOL CELL, (1999), vol. 10, pages 3473 - 3488 | - WIRTH, B.; M. BARKATS; C. MARTINAT; M. SENDTNER; T.H. GILLINGWATER, "Moving towards treatments for spinal muscular atrophy: hopes and limits", EXPERT OPINION ON EMERGING DRUGS, (2015), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1517/14728214.2015.1041375, pages 353 - 356, XP055340211 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/14728214.2015.1041375 | - WOO, C.J.; V.K. MAIER; R. DAVEY; J. BRENNAN; G. LI; J. BROTHERS, 2ND; B. SCHWARTZ; S. GORDO; A. KASPER; T.R. OKAMOTO, "Gene activation of SMN by selective disruption of lncRNA-mediated recruitment of PRC2 for the treatment of spinal muscular atrophy", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (2017), vol. 114, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.1616521114, pages E1509 - E1518, XP055355645 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1616521114 | - WU, X.S.; Z. ZHANG; W.D. ZHAO; D. WANG; F. LUO; L.G. WU, "Calcineurin is universally involved in vesicle endocytosis at neuronal and nonneuronal secretory cells", CELL REPORTS., (2014), vol. 7, pages 982 - 988 |