EP3248805 - REAL-TIME SURFACE ENERGY PRETREATMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Mailstop: XRX2-020 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Xin 230 Daniel Dr., Apt. 3 Webster, NY 14580 / US | 02 /
MCCONVILLE, Paul J. 640 Holt Road Webster, NY 14580 / US | 03 /
MOORE, Steven R. 32 Framingham Lane Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 04 /
FIORAVANTI, Alexander J. 152 Maple Hill Farm Road Penfield, NY 14526 / US | 05 /
WILLIAMS, Vincent M. 1805 Walworth Road Palmyra, NY 14522 / US | [2017/48] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2017/48] | Application number, filing date | 17172832.2 | 24.05.2017 | [2017/48] | Priority number, date | US201615166860 | 27.05.2016 Original published format: US201615166860 | [2017/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3248805 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B41M1/30, B41M5/00, B41J11/00, B41F23/00 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
B41J11/0015 (EP,US);
B41F31/005 (CN);
B41F31/00 (CN);
B41J11/00214 (EP,US);
B41M1/305 (EP,US);
B41M5/0011 (EP,US);
G05B19/04 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ECHTZEIT-OBERFLÄCHENENERGIEVORBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM | [2017/48] | English: | REAL-TIME SURFACE ENERGY PRETREATMENT SYSTEM | [2017/48] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRÉTRAITEMENT D'ÉNERGIE DE SURFACE EN TEMPS RÉEL | [2017/48] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/47] | 05.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006082604 (FLORENCE RICHARD N [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,10 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0041]; figure 1; claims 1,7,8,10 * [I] 3,8; | [XI]US2015062237 (KONDO TAKAMITSU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,10 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0083]; figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 3,8; | [XI]EP2743090 (RICOH CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0091]; figures 2-24; claims 1,2 * [I] 3,4,8,9; | [XA]US2015258811 (HIRATSUKA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * paragraphs [0009] , [0049] - paragraph [0162]; figures 1-37 * [A] 3,4,8,9; | [A]US2004017075 (KNOERZER ANTHONY ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0005] , [0015] - paragraph [0038] *; | [A]US2015273873 (KITADA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0008] - paragraphs [0019] , [0032] , [0035] * |