EP3290618 - A LEVELING HEAD ASSEMBLY FOR AN ELEVATING LEVELING PEDESTAL, SUCH ELEVATING LEVELING PEDESTAL AND A METHOD OF MAKING AN ELEVATING LEVELING PEDESTAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE IPE CLIP FASTENER COMPANY, LLC 2111 58th Avenue E. Bradenton, FL 34203 / US | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELC, Robert J. 6437 Indigo Bunting Place Bradenton, FL 34202 / US | 02 /
UPCHURCH, James Dean 5710 99th Avenue Circle E Parrish, FL 34219 / US | [2023/24] |
Former [2018/10] | 01 /
PELC, Robert J. 6437 Indigo Bunting Place Bradenton, FL Florida 34202 / US | ||
02 /
UPCHURCH, James Dean 5710 99th Avenue Circle E Parrish, FL Florida 34219 / US | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [2023/24] |
Former [2018/10] | Awapatent A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 17173311.6 | 13.03.2014 | [2018/10] | Priority number, date | US201361779085P | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361779085 P | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3290618 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3290618 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/024, E04F15/02, E04F15/20, E04D11/00 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
E04F15/02482 (EP,IL,US);
E04D11/007 (EP,IL,US);
E04F15/02183 (EP,IL,US);
E04F15/02452 (EP,IL,US);
E04F15/0247 (EP,IL,US);
E04F15/203 (EP,IL,US);
E04F2015/02094 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2018/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSGLEICHSKOPFANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN HUBAUSGLEICHSSOCKEL, HUBAUSGLEICHSSOCKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HUBAUSGLEICHSSOCKELS | [2018/10] | English: | A LEVELING HEAD ASSEMBLY FOR AN ELEVATING LEVELING PEDESTAL, SUCH ELEVATING LEVELING PEDESTAL AND A METHOD OF MAKING AN ELEVATING LEVELING PEDESTAL | [2018/10] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE TÊTE DE NIVELLEMENT POUR UN SOCLE DE NIVELLEMENT D'ÉLÉVATION, LEDIT SOCLE DE NIVELLEMENT D'ÉLÉVATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SOCLE DE NIVELLEMENT D'ÉLÉVATION | [2018/10] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 17.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.06.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14774538.4 / EP2971402 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 21.06.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 21.06.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.06.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 01.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2019 | 31.03.2022 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   20.04.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | HR | 14.06.2023 | |
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 14.06.2023 | |
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 14.09.2023 | |
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 14.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0537799 (NAKA CORP [JP]) [Y] 2 * figures 1-4 * * column 4, line 41 - line 53 *; | [Y]US5301480 (OYAMA FUMIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 4,5 * figures 11-12 * * column 9, line 51 - line 68 * * column 10, line 3 - line 16 *; | [Y]EP1106842 (FAURE DIDIER [FR]) [Y] 7 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0021] *; | [YA]US2004261329 (KUGLER WILLIAM E [US], et al) [Y] 13-15 * figures 1,4,5, 8A-8C,8E,15-16 * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0080] * [A] 12; | [Y]US2011232208 (TABIBNIA RAMIN [US]) [Y] 10 * figures 2A, 2D-2E * * paragraph [0051] ** paragraph [0058] *; | [XY]AU2006308433B (LEE ALAN SIAN GHEE [SG]) [X] 1,3,8,9,11 * abstract * * page 1, line 9 * * page 4, line 13 - line 17 * * page 7, line 31 - line 33 * * page 8, line 20 - line 24 * * page 9, line 18 - line 24 * * page 10, line 29 - line 33 * [Y] 2,4,5,7,10,13-15 | by applicant | US5301480 |