EP3410324 - DETERMINING AN ANONYMOUS DOSE REPORT IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare GmbH Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2018/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dorn, Karlheinz Erlenstr. 29 90562 Kalchreuth / DE | [2018/49] | Application number, filing date | 17173349.6 | 30.05.2017 | [2018/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3410324 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3410324 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (EP,CN);
A61B6/461 (US);
A61B6/5294 (US);
G16H15/00 (EP,CN,US);
G16H30/20 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] | Title | German: | BESTIMMEN EINES ANONYMISIERTEN DOSISBERICHTBILDES | [2018/49] | English: | DETERMINING AN ANONYMOUS DOSE REPORT IMAGE | [2018/49] | French: | DÉTERMINATION D'UNE IMAGE DE RAPPORT DE DOSE ANONYMISÉE | [2018/49] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 19.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 25.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2017 | AL | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | IT | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | NL | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | RS | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | IE | 30.05.2019 | LU | 30.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | HU | 30.05.2017 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 30.05.2017 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.05.2017 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1605348 (CANON KK [JP]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0143] *; | [A]US8694646 (KOTHARI PRAVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 16 - column 17, line 59 *; | [A]US2015128285 (LAFEVER MALCOLM GARY [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0081] * | by applicant | DE102015225735 |