EP3254946 - WORKBOAT FOR ANCHOR HANDLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAN DE NUL N.V. Tragel 60 9308 Aalst / BE | [2020/10] |
Former [2017/50] | For all designated states JAN DE NUL N.V. Tragel 60 9308 Hofstade-Aalst / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Standaert, Rutger Filip Leon Mandelvijver 24 8720 Wakken / BE | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2017/50] | Application number, filing date | 17174529.2 | 06.06.2017 | [2017/50] | Priority number, date | BE20160005423 | 07.06.2016 Original published format: BE 201605423 | BE20160005644 | 17.08.2016 Original published format: BE 201605644 | [2017/50] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3254946 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3254946 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B63B1/08, B63B35/00 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
B63B1/08 (EP);
B63B21/22 (EP);
B63B35/003 (EP);
B63B2003/147 (EP);
B63B21/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] |
Former [2017/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Validation states | MA | 11.06.2018 | Title | German: | ARBEITSBOOT ZUR HANDHABUNG EINES ANKERS | [2017/50] | English: | WORKBOAT FOR ANCHOR HANDLING | [2017/50] | French: | NAVIRE ADAPTE A LA MANIPULATION D'UNE ANCRE | [2020/08] |
Former [2017/50] | NAVIRE ADAPTÈ A LA MANIPULATION D'UNE ANCRE | Examination procedure | 06.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 15.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.02.2020 | 05.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2017 | AL | 27.05.2020 | AT | 27.05.2020 | CY | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | ES | 27.05.2020 | FI | 27.05.2020 | HR | 27.05.2020 | IT | 27.05.2020 | LT | 27.05.2020 | LV | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | MK | 27.05.2020 | MT | 27.05.2020 | PL | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | RS | 27.05.2020 | SE | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | SM | 27.05.2020 | TR | 27.05.2020 | IE | 06.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | FR | 27.07.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | NO | 27.08.2020 | GR | 28.08.2020 | IS | 27.09.2020 | PT | 28.09.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 06.06.2017 | |
AL | 27.05.2020 | ||
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
MT | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 27.07.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 27.07.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 27.05.2020 | |
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 27.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE220663 (MAXIME LAUBEUF) [Y] 5 * figure . *; | [XYI]US3866555 (KORKUT MEHMET D) [X] 1,3,13-15 * the whole document * [Y] 2,5,6 [I] 4,7-12; | [A]WO9718987 (HYDRALIFT ASA [NO], et al) [A] 1,7 * abstract *; | [X]US2002129755 (HAGEN DAGFINN [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2013051925 (FOSSO JAN [NO], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [Y]US2015217838 (ANTONSEN OTTAR [NO]) [Y] 2,6 * abstract * |