EP3412494 - HEAT DISSIPATION OF A LIQUID COOLED CHARGING CABLE AND CONNECTOR COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heid, Günter Elbenstr. 4 71277 Rutesheim / DE | 02 /
Pflugfelder, Thomas Grasmückenweg 3 71696 Möglingen / DE | [2018/50] | Application number, filing date | 17174563.1 | 06.06.2017 | [2018/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3412494 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
B60L53/16 (EP);
B60L53/18 (EP);
B60L53/302 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
Y02T90/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTWÄRMUNG EINER FLÜSSIGKEITSGEKÜHLTEN LADEKABEL- UND STECKERKOMBINATION | [2018/50] | English: | HEAT DISSIPATION OF A LIQUID COOLED CHARGING CABLE AND CONNECTOR COMBINATION | [2018/50] | French: | CHAUFFAGE D'UN CÂBLE DE CHARGE REFROIDI PAR LIQUIDE ET COMBINAISON DE CONNECTEUR | [2018/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/46] | 27.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0715391 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 42 - column 5, line 20 ** figure 1 *; | [Y]AT506376 (AMS ENGINEERING STICHT GES M B [AT]) [Y] 1-5 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 19, paragraph 4 - page 20, paragraph 3 * * figure 2 *; | [A]DE102011001633 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 20] * * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2013099024 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 23] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]DE102012220218 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0041] - [0043] - [0 62] * * figure 1 * |