EP3255011 - A DETECTION DEVICE FOR CONVEYOR, A CONVEYOR, AND AN ASSOCIATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fan Jin Quan, Kevin KONE Corp. 21; 206, Si Ji Hua Cheng Zhonghuyuan Rd. Kunshan, 215300 / CN | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | K & H Bonapat Patentanwälte Koch · von Behren & Partner mbB Donnersbergerstraße 22A 80634 München / DE | [2017/50] | Application number, filing date | 17174595.3 | 06.06.2017 | [2017/50] | Priority number, date | CN201610405683 | 08.06.2016 Original published format: CN201610405683 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3255011 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B66B29/00 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
B66B29/005 (EP,US);
B66B29/00 (CN);
B66B27/00 (US);
B66B5/0018 (CN);
G01P13/045 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] |
Former [2017/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINE DETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN FAHRSTEIG, EIN FAHRSTEIG UND EIN DAMIT VERBUNDENES VERFAHREN | [2017/50] | English: | A DETECTION DEVICE FOR CONVEYOR, A CONVEYOR, AND AN ASSOCIATED METHOD | [2017/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'UN CONVOYEUR, CONVOYEUR ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2017/50] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 18.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/19] | 05.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CN102583145 [ ]; | JP2013173575 [ ]; | [XAI]JPH10129967 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC BILL TECH) [X] 1,2,5,7,9,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022] * * figures 3-5 * [A] 3,4,6,10-12 [I] 8,13; | [XAI]KR100924658B (OTIS ELEVATOR CO) [X] 1,2,5,7,9,12,14 * figures 1-13 * [A] 3,4,6,8,11,13 [I] 10; | [XA]CN102583145 (EXPRESS ELEVATOR CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7,9,11,14 * figures 1-6 * [A] 3-6,8,10,12,13; | [XA]JP2013173575 (MITSUBISHI ELEC BUILDING TECHN) [X] 1,7,9,14 * figures 1-6 * [A] 2-6,8,10-13 | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 77, Database accession no. 2012-L76686, & CN102583145 A 20120718 (EXPRESS ELEVATOR CO LTD) [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 62, Database accession no. 2013-N05553, & JP2013173575 A 20130905 (MITSUBISHI DENKI BUIL TECHNO SERVICE KK) [ ] * abstract * |