EP3267231 - CONNECTION PLUG WITH A BASE OF A HOUSING PANEL OF ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT, PROVIDED WITH MEANS TO PREVENT THE BREAKAGE OF THE OPTICAL CABLE ON WHICH THE PLUG IS FITTED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RADIALL 25 rue Madeleine Vionnet 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [2018/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUPEUX, Benoit 1978 route de Cras 38470 VATILIEU / FR | 02 /
BOURGEAS, Fabien 96 allée du Plan Robert 38500 SAINT NICOLAS DE MACHERIN / FR | 03 /
LOMUSCIO, Dominique 46 chemin des amandiers 38590 SILLANS / FR | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/02] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 17174945.0 | 08.06.2017 | [2018/02] | Priority number, date | FR20160056520 | 07.07.2016 Original published format: FR 1656520 | [2018/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3267231 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3267231 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42, G02B6/38 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
G02B6/4292 (EP,US);
G02B6/3893 (EP,US);
G02B6/4278 (US);
G02B6/4284 (US);
H01R13/5219 (US);
H01R13/53 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Title | German: | STECKERSTIFT ZUR VERBINDUNG MIT EINER BUCHSE EINES GEHÄUSEPANEELS EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN GERÄTS, DER MIT BRUCHSCHUTZMITTELN FÜR DAS OPTISCHE KABEL AUSGESTATTET IST, AN DEM DER STECKER MONTIERT IST | [2018/02] | English: | CONNECTION PLUG WITH A BASE OF A HOUSING PANEL OF ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT, PROVIDED WITH MEANS TO PREVENT THE BREAKAGE OF THE OPTICAL CABLE ON WHICH THE PLUG IS FITTED | [2018/02] | French: | FICHE DE CONNEXION A UNE EMBASE DE PANNEAU DE BOITIER D'EQUIPEMENT ELECTRONIQUE, MUNIE DE MOYENS D'ANTI-CASSE DE CÂBLE OPTIQUE SUR LEQUEL LA FICHE EST MONTEE | [2018/02] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 23.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2017 | AL | 18.07.2018 | AT | 18.07.2018 | CY | 18.07.2018 | CZ | 18.07.2018 | DK | 18.07.2018 | EE | 18.07.2018 | ES | 18.07.2018 | FI | 18.07.2018 | HR | 18.07.2018 | IT | 18.07.2018 | LT | 18.07.2018 | LV | 18.07.2018 | MC | 18.07.2018 | MK | 18.07.2018 | MT | 18.07.2018 | NL | 18.07.2018 | PL | 18.07.2018 | RO | 18.07.2018 | RS | 18.07.2018 | SE | 18.07.2018 | SI | 18.07.2018 | SK | 18.07.2018 | SM | 18.07.2018 | TR | 18.07.2018 | BG | 18.10.2018 | NO | 18.10.2018 | GR | 19.10.2018 | IS | 18.11.2018 | PT | 18.11.2018 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.06.2017 | |
AL | 18.07.2018 | ||
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CY | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.06.2017 | |
AL | 18.07.2018 | ||
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CY | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CY | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 18.07.2018 | |
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 18.07.2018 | |
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 18.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004240801 (MALAGRINO GERALD DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-5* paragraphs [0029] - [0031] *; | [A]US2005018979 (MIZUE TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0033] * * figures 3,4 *; | [AD]WO2012101569 (RADIALL SA [FR], et al) [AD] 1-5 * abstract * * page 10, lines 12, 17,27 * * page 11, lines 3,4,26-28 * * figures 1,3 * |