EP3258358 - INTEGRATED TOUCH DISPLAY WITH A SINGLE LAYERED CAPACITIVE TOUCH PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jang, Hyoungwook 480, Galmae-ro Sejong-city 205-504 / KR | 02 /
Ko, Gwang-bum 16, Bongyeong-ro 1744beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 244-904 / KR | 03 /
Na, Hyunjae Hanyang 1 Cha. Apt., Ssangmun 3-dong Dobong-gu Seoul 6-207 / KR | [2023/15] |
Former [2017/51] | 01 /
Jang, Hyoungwook 480, Galmae-ro 205-504 Sejong-city / KR | ||
02 /
Ko, Gwang-bum 16, Bongyeong-ro 1744beon-gil 244-904 Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Na, Hyunjae Hanyang 1 Cha. Apt., Ssangmun 3-dong 6-207 Dobong-gu, Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2017/51] | Application number, filing date | 17175942.6 | 14.06.2017 | [2017/51] | Priority number, date | KR20160075308 | 16.06.2016 Original published format: KR 20160075308 | [2017/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3258358 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3258358 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/044 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
G06F3/04164 (EP,US);
G06F3/0416 (KR);
H10K59/40 (CN,US);
G06F3/0412 (CN,KR,US);
G06F3/044 (KR);
G06F3/0443 (EP,US);
G09G3/3233 (KR);
H10K59/1213 (US);
H10K59/131 (US);
G06F2203/04102 (US);
G06F2203/04103 (KR);
G06F2203/04112 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/51] | G06F3/044 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2017/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES BERÜHRUNGSEMPFINDLICHES ANZEIGEGERÄT MIT EINEM EINSCHICHTIGEN KAPAZITIVEN TOUCH-PANEL | [2022/47] | English: | INTEGRATED TOUCH DISPLAY WITH A SINGLE LAYERED CAPACITIVE TOUCH PANEL | [2017/51] | French: | ÉCRAN TACTILE INTÉGRÉ AVEC UN PANNEAU TACTILE CAPACITIF À COUCHE UNIQUE | [2022/47] |
Former [2017/51] | INTEGRIERTER BERÜHRUNGSSENSOR UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM KAPAZITIVEN EIN-LAGEN-BERÜHRUNGSSENSOR | ||
Former [2017/51] | ÉCRAN TACTILE INTÉGRÉ AVEC PANNEAU TACTILE CAPACITIF À COUCHE UNIQUE | Examination procedure | 14.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 04.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 01.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 22.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.04.2023 | CZ | 12.04.2023 | DK | 12.04.2023 | EE | 12.04.2023 | ES | 12.04.2023 | FI | 12.04.2023 | HR | 12.04.2023 | LT | 12.04.2023 | LV | 12.04.2023 | MC | 12.04.2023 | PL | 12.04.2023 | RO | 12.04.2023 | RS | 12.04.2023 | SE | 12.04.2023 | SK | 12.04.2023 | SM | 12.04.2023 | IE | 14.06.2023 | LU | 14.06.2023 | NO | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.07.2023 | IS | 12.08.2023 | PT | 14.08.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/15] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
LU | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 12.04.2023 | |
PT | 14.08.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011291977 (MORIWAKI HIROYUKI [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0167] * * paragraph [0169] * * paragraph [0171] *; | [XI]US2014078077 (CHOI HO-WON [KR]) [X] 10-12 * figures 2, 3 * * paragraphs [0057] - [0059] * * paragraphs [0065] - [0066] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0094] *[I] 13-15; | [Y]US2015261348 (JANG HYOUNG WOOK [KR], et al) [Y] 1-9 * figures 2, 5 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraphs [0079] - [0080] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0053] * * paragraphs [0056] - [0057] * * paragraphs [0059] - [0061] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0066] * |