EP3257359 - BINDING MACHINE FOR GARDENING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max Co., Ltd. 6-6 Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Susumu Max Co., Ltd. 6-6 Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | 02 /
Taguchi, Satoshi Max Co., Ltd. 6-6 Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | 03 /
Takemura, Hajime Max Co., Ltd. 6-6 Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | [2020/09] |
Former [2017/51] | 01 /
Hayashi, Susumu Max Co., Ltd. 6-6 Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
Taguchi, Satoshi Max Co., Ltd. 6-6 Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
Takemura, Hajime Max Co., Ltd. 6-6 Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2017/51] | Application number, filing date | 17175969.9 | 14.06.2017 | [2017/51] | Priority number, date | JP20160119281 | 15.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016119281 | [2017/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3257359 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3257359 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01G17/08 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
A01G17/08 (EP,CN,US);
A01G17/085 (KR,US);
A01G9/128 (CN);
A01B1/00 (KR,US);
B65B13/345 (CN,US);
B65B27/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] |
Former [2017/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BINDEMASCHINE FÜR DEN GARTENBAU | [2017/51] | English: | BINDING MACHINE FOR GARDENING | [2017/51] | French: | MACHINE À LIER POUR LE JARDINAGE | [2017/51] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 13.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20153834.5 / EP3662745 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | LU | 14.06.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | CY | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 14.06.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 14.06.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 14.06.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007013158 (AGLIS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * * paragraphs [0011] - [0025] *; | [A]JP2008072928 (NAGASHIMA JUNICHI, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document ** figure 4 *; | [XA]EP2664233 (MAX CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * abstract * * figures 18-30 * * paragraphs [0054] - [0065] * [A] 5,6,9 | by applicant | JP2004224412 |