EP3276545 - SETTING CONTROL METHOD AND SETTING CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyamoto, Akihiro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Ito, Fumito c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/05] | Application number, filing date | 17176348.5 | 16.06.2017 | [2018/05] | Priority number, date | JP20160147866 | 27.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016147866 | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3276545 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/04, G06Q50/14 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
G06Q10/047 (EP,US);
G06Q10/1093 (CN);
G01C21/343 (US);
G01C21/3476 (US);
G06F16/29 (EP,US);
G06Q50/14 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] |
Former [2018/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSTELLSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND EINSTELLSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/05] | English: | SETTING CONTROL METHOD AND SETTING CONTROL DEVICE | [2018/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE RÉGLAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE RÉGLAGE | [2018/05] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 30.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.05.2020 | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | 06.03.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 08.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009157664 (WEN CHIH PO [US]) [I] 1-6 * abstract * * figure 6 ** paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0156] *; | [I]US2014229102 (BAPNA ANSHUMAN [IN], et al) [I] 1-6 * abstract * * figures 1,6 * * paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0139] * | by applicant | JP2000193478 | JP2007271366 |