EP3417758 - A METHOD FOR PROCESSING IMAGE DATA USING A NON-LINEAR SCALING MODEL AND A MEDICAL VISUAL AID SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ambu A/S Baltorpbakken 13 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONNENBORG, Finn Muldager 2 3600 Frederikssund / DK | 02 /
NIELSEN, Brian Niels W. Gades Vej 28 4700 Næstved / DK | 03 /
JOHANSSON, Curt Allan Nektarinvägen 18 224 56 Lund / SE | 04 /
SEBASTIAN, Ortega Zafra Törnskärsgatan 2C 217 44 Malmö / SE | 05 /
YANG, Qian Drapavägen 63 224 74 Lund / SE | 06 /
CHAN, Kai-Cheng 4F., No.29, Ln. 22, Fuguo Rd., Xinzhuang Dist. 242 New Taipei City / TW | 07 /
CHANG-YU, Wang 8F., No.73, Ln. 86, Fude 1st Rd., Xizhi Dist. 221 New Taipei City / TW | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [2018/52] | Application number, filing date | 17176592.8 | 19.06.2017 | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3417758 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, G06T5/00, G06T5/10, G06T5/40, H04N5/235 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
A61B1/000095 (EP,US);
A61B1/00045 (EP,US);
A61B1/00103 (EP);
A61B1/0684 (US);
G06T5/20 (US);
G06T5/90 (EP,US);
G06T5/92 (US);
H04N23/56 (EP);
H04N23/63 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON BILDDATEN MIT EINEM NICHTLINEAREN SKALIERUNGSMODELL UND MEDIZINISCHES SEHHILFESYSTEM | [2018/52] | English: | A METHOD FOR PROCESSING IMAGE DATA USING A NON-LINEAR SCALING MODEL AND A MEDICAL VISUAL AID SYSTEM | [2018/52] | French: | UN PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES D'IMAGE À LE AIDE D'UN MODÈLE DE MISE À LE ÉCHELLE NON LINÉAIRE ET UN SYSTÈME DE PROTHÈSE VISUELLE MÉDICAL | [2018/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/49] | 15.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04197331 (FUJI PHOTO OPTICAL CO LTD); | [X]US6441845 (MATSUMOTO KANICHI [JP]); | [X]US2006241418 (ABE KAZUNORI [JP]); | [X]EP2690868 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) | by applicant | US4774565 | WO2014106511 |