EP3259979 - THRESHING ELEMENT FOR COMBINE HARVESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taxil La Baisse de Saint-Anne 04210 Valensole / FR | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAXIL, Robert La Baisse de Saint-Anne 04210 Valensole / FR | [2019/51] |
Former [2017/52] | 01 /
TAXIL, Robert LA BAISSE DE SAINT-ANNE 04210 VALENSOLE / FR | Representative(s) | Remy, Vincent Noel Paul LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [2017/52] | Application number, filing date | 17176759.3 | 20.06.2017 | [2017/52] | Priority number, date | FR20160055901 | 24.06.2016 Original published format: FR 1655901 | [2017/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3259979 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3259979 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01F12/22 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
A01F12/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] |
Former [2017/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DRESCHELEMENT FÜR MÄHDRESCHER | [2017/52] | English: | THRESHING ELEMENT FOR COMBINE HARVESTER | [2017/52] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE BATTAGE POUR MOISSONNEUSES BATTEUSES | [2017/52] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 13.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2017 | AL | 18.12.2019 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | DK | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | NL | 18.12.2019 | PL | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | RS | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | TR | 18.12.2019 | BG | 18.03.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | IE | 20.06.2020 | LU | 20.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.06.2017 | |
AL | 18.12.2019 | ||
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 20.06.2020 | ||
LU | 20.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 20.06.2020 | ||
LU | 20.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 20.06.2020 | ||
LU | 20.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 20.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US4889517 (STRONG RUSSELL W [BE], et al) [I] 1 * figures 10-13 * [A] 2-15; | [A]US2009197655 (ELLINGSON MICHAEL B [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2012110090 (CNH BELGIUM NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |