EP3253170 - METHOD AND APPARATUSES FOR RANDOM ACCESS IN AN ORTHOGONAL MULTIPLE-ACCESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALLADI, Durga Prasad c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
DAMNJANOVIC, Aleksandar c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
MONTOJO, Juan c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | Hohgardt, Martin Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17177224.7 | 21.08.2007 | [2017/49] | Priority number, date | US20060839220P | 21.08.2006 Original published format: US 839220 P | US20060828058P | 03.10.2006 Original published format: US 828058 P | US20060863610P | 31.10.2006 Original published format: US 863610 P | US20070841609 | 20.08.2007 Original published format: US 841609 | [2017/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3253170 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3253170 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3253170 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04W56/00, H04W74/00, H04L1/00, H04L5/00, H04L25/03, H04W88/02 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
H04L5/003 (EP,KR,NO,US);
H04L1/0029 (EP,BR,KR,NO,US);
H04W74/002 (EP,BR,KR,NO,US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,BR,KR,NO,US);
H04L1/0026 (KR);
H04L1/0032 (EP,BR,KR,NO,US);
H04L1/0061 (EP,BR,KR,NO,US);
H04L25/03866 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,BR,KR,NO,US);
H04L5/0057 (EP,US);
H04L5/0091 (EP,BR,KR,NO,US);
H04W72/20 (KR);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L5/0037 (EP,US);
H04L5/006 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/49] | H04W74/08, H04W56/00, H04W74/00, H04L1/00, H04L5/00, H04L25/03 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR DIREKTZUGRIFF IN EINEM ORTHOGONALEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT MEHRFACHZUGRIFF | [2017/49] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUSES FOR RANDOM ACCESS IN AN ORTHOGONAL MULTIPLE-ACCESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2017/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIFS D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION ORTHOGONAL D'ACCÈS MULTIPLE | [2020/20] |
Former [2017/49] | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION ORTHOGONAL D'ACCÈS MULTIPLE | Examination procedure | 21.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 21.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07814307.0 / EP2064908 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.10.2020 | EE | 07.10.2020 | LT | 07.10.2020 | LV | 07.10.2020 | MC | 07.10.2020 | MT | 07.10.2020 | SK | 07.10.2020 | BG | 07.01.2021 | IS | 07.02.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2023/24] | CY | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | EE | 07.10.2020 | |
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 07.10.2020 | |
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | LT | 07.10.2020 | |
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | LT | 07.10.2020 | |
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | LV | 07.10.2020 | |
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | LV | 07.10.2020 | |
BG | 07.01.2021 |