EP3272850 - EASY IRONING/ANTI-WRINKLE/LESS CREASE BENEFIT OF FABRIC TREATMENT COMPOSITIONS WITH THE HELP OF SOIL RELEASE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/04] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATIL, Ketan Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Heinestraße 3 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 02 /
RÖLEKE, Christina Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Kaiserstr. 64 41061 Mönchengladbach / DE | 03 /
KRAUS, Ingrid Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Grünberger Weg 20 40627 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/04] | Application number, filing date | 17177412.8 | 22.06.2017 | [2018/04] | Priority number, date | DE201610213179 | 19.07.2016 Original published format: DE102016213179 | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3272850 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C11D11/00 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
C11D3/3715 (EP);
D06M15/09 (EP);
D06M15/507 (EP);
C11D2111/12 (EP);
D06M2200/01 (EP);
D06M2200/20 (EP);
D06M23/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORTEIL VON LEICHTEM BÜGELN/WENIGER FALTEN/WENIGER KNITTERN VON STOFFBEHANDLUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MITHILFE VON SCHMUTZLÖSENDEN POLYMEREN | [2018/04] | English: | EASY IRONING/ANTI-WRINKLE/LESS CREASE BENEFIT OF FABRIC TREATMENT COMPOSITIONS WITH THE HELP OF SOIL RELEASE POLYMERS | [2018/04] | French: | AVANTAGE DE REPASSAGE SIMPLE/ANTI-FROISSEMENT/RÉDUCTION DE PLIS DE COMPOSITIONS DE TRAITEMENT DE TEXTILES À L'AIDE DE POLYMÈRES ANTISALISSURES | [2018/04] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 22.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4132680 (NICOL CHARLES H) [A] 1-13 * example I; table I ** column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 49 *; | [XI]US4169064 (SAGEL JOHN A, et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,9,12,13 * example I * * column 1, line 32 - line 58 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 43 * [I] 2,5,7,10,11; | [X]EP0752468 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,8,9,12,13 * page 2, line 33 - line 37 *; | [XI]CN103321055 (ZHANGJIAGANG DUPLUS CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4,6,8,9,11-13 * example 1 * * paragraphs [0020] - [0025] - [0 50] - [0052] * [I] 2,5,7,10 | by applicant | DE233504 | US3893929 | US3959230 | US4000093 | US4007305 | US4137180 | US4201824 | US4240918 | US4525524 | EP0150872 | US4579681 | EP0219048 | US4702857 | US4711730 | US4721580 | EP0258923 | EP0279134 | US4787989 | US4877896 | US4956447 | US4968451 | EP0457205 | EP0593542 | US5415807 | EP0707627 | EP0991743 | US7087572 | EP2135931 | - JOHNSON; SHOOLERY, Anal. Chem., (19620000), vol. 34, page 1136 |