EP3419042 - X-RAY TUBE INSULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEHLING, Rolf Karl Otto c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Schlenk, Tobias c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
REPENNING, Thorben c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/52] | Application number, filing date | 17177556.2 | 23.06.2017 | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3419042 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01J35/16 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
H01J35/165 (EP,US);
H01J2235/0233 (EP,US);
H05G1/54 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÖNTGENRÖHRENISOLATOR | [2018/52] | English: | X-RAY TUBE INSULATOR | [2018/52] | French: | ISOLATEUR DE TUBE À RAYONS X | [2018/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/49] | 15.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4811375 (KLOSTERMANN HEINRICH F [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,10,12-15 * column 1, line 10 - line 23 * * column 19, line 23 - line 49; figures 16,18 * * column 21, line 43 - column 22, line 25 * [I] 8; | [X]US4964148 (KLOSTERMANN HEINRICH F [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 5, lines 41-64 ** column 18, line 38 - column 23, line 51; figures 21,22,24,25 *; | [XY]JP2001124899 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [X] 1-4,6,11-15 * abstract * [Y] 14,15; | [X]JP2009068973 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [X] 1-4,6,11-15 * abstract *; | [XY]US2016209288 (KELLY BRANDON J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,11-13 * paragraphs [0052] - [0055]; figures 1A, 1F * [Y] 14,15 |