EP3264405 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Yang Wan 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Jae Yong 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kwon, Sun Ja 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Park, Hyun Ae 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Kim, Byung Sun 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Lee, Su Jin 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Park, Hyung Jun 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 08 /
Jeon, Yu Jin 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2018/01] | Application number, filing date | 17178307.9 | 28.06.2017 | [2018/01] | Priority number, date | KR20160083128 | 30.06.2016 Original published format: KR 20160083128 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3264405 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3264405 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3233 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
H10K59/88 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/3266 (US);
G09G3/3258 (US);
H01L27/124 (KR);
H10K50/80 (KR);
H10K59/131 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/352 (KR,US);
G09G2300/0413 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0426 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0861 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0251 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0262 (EP,US);
G09G2310/08 (US);
G09G2320/0223 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/47] |
Former [2018/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/01] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2018/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2018/01] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/47] | 11.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/38] | 07.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.05.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008218450 (PARK YOUNG-JONG [KR]) [Y] 14,15,37,38 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0031] ** paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1, 5 *; | [XY]EP2085952 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-8,11-13,19,20,23,24 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0129]; figures 1-12 * [Y] 1-39; | [Y]US2016019856 (TANAKA KOHHEI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-39 * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0349]; figures 1-36b * |