EP3296693 - DOUBLE-LAYER HIGH-CONFINEMENT ACOUSTO-OPTIC WAVEGUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUCKETT, Matthew Wade c/o Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2018/12] | Application number, filing date | 17178894.6 | 30.06.2017 | [2018/12] | Priority number, date | US201662397082P | 20.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662397082 P | US201615379165 | 14.12.2016 Original published format: US201615379165 | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3296693 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/72, G01N29/00, G02B6/10, G02B6/122, // G01K11/32 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
G02F1/125 (EP,US);
G01C19/722 (US);
G01C19/727 (EP,US);
G01K11/322 (EP,US);
G01N29/00 (EP,US);
G02B6/122 (EP,US);
G02F2201/06 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELSCHICHTIGER AKUSTO-OPTISCHER WELLENLEITER MIT HOHER BESCHRÄNKUNG | [2018/12] | English: | DOUBLE-LAYER HIGH-CONFINEMENT ACOUSTO-OPTIC WAVEGUIDE | [2018/12] | French: | GUIDE D'ONDES ACOUSTO-OPTIQUE DOUBLE COUCHE À HAUT CONFINEMENT | [2018/12] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 30.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/16] | 25.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - RAPHAËL VAN LAER ET AL, "Analysis of enhanced stimulated Brillouin scattering in silicon slot waveguides", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, vol. 39, no. 5, doi:10.1364/OL.39.001242, ISSN 0146-9592, (20140301), pages 1242 - 1245, (20140225), XP001589183 [X] 1,4-6 * the whole document * [I] 2,3,7-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.39.001242 | [XI] - SARABALIS CHRISTOPHER J ET AL, "Guided acoustic and optical waves in silicon-on-insulator for Brillouin scattering and optomechanics", APL PHOTONICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, 2 HUNTINGTON QUADRANGLE, MELVILLE, NY 11747, (20160801), vol. 1, no. 7, doi:10.1063/1.4955002, XP012215673 [X] 1,3,4,6,7 * the whole document * [I] 2,5,8-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.4955002 | [A] - BENJAMIN J. EGGLETON ET AL, "Inducing and harnessing stimulated Brillouin scattering in photonic integrated circuits", ADVANCES IN OPTICS AND PHOTONICS, (20131219), vol. 5, no. 4, doi:10.1364/AOP.5.000536, page 536, XP055280419 [A] 1-10 * page 541, paragraph 1 * * page 555 - page 557 * * figures 2,12,13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AOP.5.000536 |