EP3273426 - ROUTING AIRCRAFT GROUND MOVEMENTS AT AN AIRPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2023/46] |
Former [2018/04] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Manuj c/o Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 02 /
MACEK, Karel c/o Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ N07950 / US | 03 /
BELAMKONDA, Kameswararao c/o Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 04 /
SUMANTH, E c/o Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2018/04] | Application number, filing date | 17179365.6 | 03.07.2017 | [2018/04] | Priority number, date | US201615212491 | 18.07.2016 Original published format: US201615212491 | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3273426 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3273426 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/06, G08G5/00, G08G5/04 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
G08G5/065 (EP,US);
G08G5/0013 (EP,US);
G08G5/0026 (EP,US);
G08G5/0039 (EP,US);
G08G5/0043 (EP,US);
G08G5/0082 (EP,US);
G08G5/045 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Title | German: | ROUTEN DER BODENBEWEGUNGEN EINES FLUGZEUGS AUF EINEM FLUGHAFEN | [2018/04] | English: | ROUTING AIRCRAFT GROUND MOVEMENTS AT AN AIRPORT | [2018/04] | French: | GUIDAGE DES MOUVEMENTS AUX SOL D'UN AVION SUR UN AÉROPORT | [2023/29] |
Former [2018/04] | L'ACHEMINEMENT DES MOUVEMENTSAUXSOL D'UN AVION SUR UN AÉROPORT | Examination procedure | 03.07.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 03.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.06.2023 | 26.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6144915 (SHIOMI KAKUICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP2289754 (TOYOTA MOTOR EUROPE NV SA [BE], et al); | [A]US2011133888 (STEVENS TIMOTHY DIRK [US], et al); | [A]US2014097984 (STEVENS TIM [US]); | [XYI]EP2975596 (BOEING CO [US]); | [XYI]US2016163208 (ZHOU ZHI [US], et al); | [A]EP3043331 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) | Examination | US2010125403 | EP2584550 |