EP3425519 - METHOD FOR THE COMPUTER-ASSISTED CONFIGURING A DATA-BASED MODEL BASED ON TRAINING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 17.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGEL, Thomas Härtsfeldstraße 146 73432 Aalen / DE | 02 /
GIGLER, Alexander Michael Brechtstraße 26 86836 Untermeitingen / DE | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 17179817.6 | 05.07.2017 | [2019/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3425519 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/18, G01J3/28 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
G06F17/18 (EP);
G06N3/08 (US);
G01J3/28 (EP);
G06N3/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] |
Former [2019/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM RECHNERGESTÜTZTEN KONFIGURIEREN EINES DATENGETRIEBENEN MODELLS BASIEREND AUF TRAININGSDATEN | [2019/02] | English: | METHOD FOR THE COMPUTER-ASSISTED CONFIGURING A DATA-BASED MODEL BASED ON TRAINING DATA | [2019/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION ASSISTÉE PAR ORDINATEUR D'UN MODÈLE COMMANDÉ PAR DES DONNÉES EN FONCTION DE DONNÉES D'APPRENTISSAGE | [2019/02] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 18.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/34] | 16.07.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.09.2020 | 03.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7084973 (INGRAM SIMON GARETH [CA]) [A] 2* column 2 - column 6 *; | [XI] - TIANWEI YU ET AL, "Improving peak detection in high-resolution LC/MS metabolomics data using preexisting knowledge and machine learning approach", BIOINFORMATICS., GB, (20140707), vol. 30, no. 20, doi:10.1093/bioinformatics/btu430, ISSN 1367-4803, pages 2941 - 2948, XP055443736 [X] 1 * abstract * * Abschnitte 1 und 2 * [I] 2-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/btu430 | [XI] - Sankaranarayanan Mahadevan, "DATA-BASED FAULT DETECTION AND DIAGNOSIS IN BIOLOGICAL AND PROCESS SYSTEMS", Doctoral thesis, University of Alberta, Edmonton, Alberta, (20091201), URL: http://www.collectionscanada.gc.ca/obj/thesescanada/vol2/002/NR55824.PDF, (20180123), XP055443744 [X] 1 * Abschnitte 1.2.2, 1.2.3, 3.3.3, 3.4, 4.2, 4.3 * [I] 2-16 |