EP3267248 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2018/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Keun Woo 103-1205, 43, Nojeoksan-ro, Nam-gu Incheon / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jang II 102-2103, 37 Tangjeongmyeon-ro Tangjeong-myeon, Asan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 03 /
WOO, Su Wan 101-901, 52-21, Gyeonggi-daero, Osan-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/02] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17180124.4 | 06.07.2017 | [2018/02] | Priority number, date | KR20160085280 | 06.07.2016 Original published format: KR 20160085280 | [2018/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3267248 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1343, G02F1/1337 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
G02F1/134309 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/133707 (EP,US);
G02F1/13439 (US);
G02F1/136227 (KR);
G02F1/136286 (KR);
G02F1/1368 (KR,US);
H01L27/124 (US);
G02F1/133357 (US);
G02F1/133514 (US);
G02F1/136218 (US);
G02F1/137 (US);
G02F2201/121 (US);
G02F2201/123 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2018/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/02] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE | [2018/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2018/02] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 17.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/02] | 04.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2520974 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-7,16-19 * abstract * * figures 1-3,10 * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0121] * [I] 8-15,20; | [XA]US2013242219 (YUN SUNG-JAE [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,16,18 * abstract * * figure 9a * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0146] * [A] 4,5,8-15,17,19,20; | [XA]US2015055040 (KWON OH JEONG [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,16,18,20 * abstract * * figure 7 * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0103] *[A] 4-15,17,19 |