EP3258167 - OPTICAL CONSTRUCTIONS INCORPORATING A LIGHT GUIDE AND LOW REFRACTIVE INDEX FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Co. 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wheatley, John A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2017/51] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/51] | Application number, filing date | 17180389.3 | 01.12.2010 | [2017/51] | Priority number, date | US20090267631P | 08.12.2009 Original published format: US 267631 P | [2017/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3258167 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3258167 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F21V8/00 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
G02B6/0056 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0051 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0018 (US);
G02B6/0021 (US);
G02B6/0035 (US);
G02B6/005 (US);
G02B6/0053 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0055 (KR);
G02B6/0068 (US);
G02B6/0073 (US);
G02B6/0075 (US);
G02F1/133603 (KR);
G02F1/133606 (KR);
G02F1/133615 (KR);
G02B2207/107 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE KONSTRUKTIONEN MIT EINEM LICHTLEITER UND FOLIEN MIT NIEDRIGEM BRECHUNGSINDEX | [2017/51] | English: | OPTICAL CONSTRUCTIONS INCORPORATING A LIGHT GUIDE AND LOW REFRACTIVE INDEX FILMS | [2017/51] | French: | CONSTRUCTIONS OPTIQUE COMPRENANT UN GUIDE DE LUMIÈRE ET DES FILMS À FAIBLE INDICE DE RÉFRACTION | [2017/51] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/16] | 26.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10787647.6 / EP2510389 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008291696 (KIM JI-GON [KR], et al) [X] 1,6,9,14 * paragraphs [0052] - [0061] - [0081]; figure 2 * [I] 3,10,11,13; | [XI]US2006056166 (YEO TERENCE E [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,9,14 * paragraph [0090]; figure 21 * * paragraph [0041] * [I] 10,11,13; | [IA]EP1855150 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1,2,4-6,9-14 * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] - [0 31]; figures 2,3a * [A] 3; | [XI]US2006245718 (WINSTON ROLAND [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,8,14 * paragraph [0129]; figure 6a * * paragraph [0192] * * paragraphs [0203] - [0212]; figures 19b,20c * [I] 2,3,11,13,510; | [I]US2004233657 (LIN JYH-CHAIN [TW]) [I] 1,3,6,10,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] *; | [XDP]WO2010120845 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [XDP] 1,3-6,9,14 * figure 1 * * page 6, lines 13-15 * * page 7, lines 4-22 * * page 12, paragraphs 16-25 * * page 13, lines 18-20 * * page 9, lines 24-28 *; | [A] - BELLUNATO T ET AL, "Refractive index of silica aerogel: Uniformity and dispersion law", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH. SECTION A: ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS, AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, ELSEVIER BV * NORTH-HOLLAND, NL, vol. 595, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.NIMA.2008.07.072, ISSN 0168-9002, (20080921), pages 183 - 186, (20080719), XP025430715 [A] 1,3,6-14 * page 183, column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nima.2008.07.072 | by applicant | US6719426 | US2008064133 | US6197397 | US2007000606 | WO0056556 | US4539256 | US5120594 | US6280063 | WO2009123928 | US20080116132 | US20080116291 | US20080116294 | US20080116295 | WO2008US64115 | US20090169466 | US20090254673 |