EP3425781 - MOTOR USING PERMANENT MAGNETS WITH MOVABLE STATOR, CONTROLLED BY LINEAR ACTUATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ocwieja, Agnieszka ul. Miastkowska 55a 60-184 Poznan / PL | [2023/11] |
Former [2019/02] | For all designated states Ocwieja, Jaroslaw ul.Miastkowska 55a 60-184 Poznan / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Sawicki, Igor Kancelaria Patentowa Igor Sawicki Ul. Filtrowa 30/18 02-032 Warszawa / PL | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 17180404.0 | 08.07.2017 | [2019/02] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3425781 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3425781 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02K49/10, H02K1/276, // H02K7/06 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
H02K49/10 (EP);
H02K1/2773 (EP);
H02K7/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/02] | H02K49/10, // H02K7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] |
Former [2019/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MOTOR MIT VERWENDUNG VON PERMANENTMAGNETEN MIT BEWEGLICHEM STATOR, GESTEUERT DURCH LINEARANTRIEBE | [2019/02] | English: | MOTOR USING PERMANENT MAGNETS WITH MOVABLE STATOR, CONTROLLED BY LINEAR ACTUATORS | [2019/02] | French: | MOTEUR UTILISANT DES AIMANTS PERMANENTS AVEC STATOR MOBILE COMMANDÉ PAR DES ACTIONNEURS LINÉAIRES | [2019/02] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 23.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 07.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/45] | 30.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 08.05.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 08.05.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 02.10.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.10.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.10.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.10.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 02.10.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.10.2019 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 23.06.2020 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.2020 | 28.03.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.2021 | 31.07.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2022 | 31.07.2022 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   01.02.2023 | 31.07.2023 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA882881 (SABO JOSEPH); | [YA]JPS60167677 (YUNIKAMU KK); | [Y]US2009134731 (OKUMOTO KAZUSHIGE [JP], et al); | [A]WO2009127123 (JIA DONGMING [CN]); | [A]US2012062048 (KANEKO YASUO [JP]) | by applicant | US4151431 | PL207450 | PL224308 | US4751486 | US5594289 | WO2012173757 | US2013134713 |