EP3269934 - STRUCTURE COMPRISING A REFLECTIVE THERMAL BARRIER COATING AND CORRESPONDING METHOD OF CREATING A THERMAL BARRIER COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Collins Engine Nozzles, Inc. 811 4th Street West Des Moines, IA 50265 / US | [2022/19] |
Former [2018/03] | For all designated states Delavan, Inc. 811 4th Street West Des Moines, IA 50265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAROSELSKY, Alexander 80 Fox Hollow Avon, CT 06001 / US | 02 /
MARTIN, Thomas J. 46 Tarragon Drive East Hampton, CT 06424 / US | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/35] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2018/03] | de Bresser, Sara Jean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17180782.9 | 11.07.2017 | [2018/03] | Priority number, date | US201615208066 | 12.07.2016 Original published format: US201615208066 | [2018/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3269934 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3269934 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/28, F01D25/00, C23C4/04, C23C28/00 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
B05D7/24 (US);
C23C28/42 (EP,US);
C23C4/04 (EP,US);
C23C4/12 (US);
F01D25/005 (EP,US);
F05D2220/323 (US);
F05D2230/90 (EP,US);
F05D2240/30 (US);
F05D2300/17 (US);
F05D2300/21 (US);
F05D2300/2118 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] |
Former [2018/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STRUKTUR MIT EINER REFLEKTIERENDEN WÄRMEDÄMMSCHICHT UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WÄRMEDÄMMSCHICHT | [2018/03] | English: | STRUCTURE COMPRISING A REFLECTIVE THERMAL BARRIER COATING AND CORRESPONDING METHOD OF CREATING A THERMAL BARRIER COATING | [2018/03] | French: | STRUCTURE AYANT UN REVÊTEMENT RÉFLECHISSANT DE BARRIÈRE THERMIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN REVÊTEMENT DE BARRIÈRE THERMIQUE | [2018/03] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6210791 (SKOOG ANDREW J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-12,14 * figures 1-8 * * column 4, line 43 - column 10, line 67 *[I] 7; | [XI]US6465090 (STOWELL WILLIAM R [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-12,14 * figures 1, 2 * * column 2, line 60 - column 6, line 47 * [I] 7; | [X]DE102009015154 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [X] 1-6,9-14 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0029] *; | [XI]US2011280717 (WADA KUNIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10,12 * figures 1-12 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0064] * [I] 7,8; | [XP]EP3088559 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [XP] 1-6,9-15 * figures 1, 2, 4A-4F * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0028] * | Examination | US4916022 |