EP3269748 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING RIGID POLYMER FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2018/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prissok, Frank Vossweg 4 49448 Lemförde / DE | 02 /
Harms, Michael Steinstr. 10 49356 Diepholz / DE | 03 /
Koch, Sebastian Muehlenweg 2 49448 Lemförde / DE | 04 /
Kampf, Gunnar Jahnstrasse 9 32369 Rahden / DE | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/03] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17180941.1 | 12.07.2017 | [2018/03] | Priority number, date | EP20160179196 | 13.07.2016 Original published format: EP 16179196 | [2018/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3269748 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/34, C08G18/66, C08G18/76, C08K5/00, C08G18/16, C08G18/18, C08G18/20, C08K5/521, C08L75/04, C08J9/00 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
C08G18/341 (EP);
C08G18/166 (EP);
C08G18/18 (EP);
C08G18/2027 (EP);
C08G18/664 (EP);
C08G18/6659 (EP);
C08G18/7664 (EP);
C08K5/0066 (EP);
C08K5/521 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0066, C08L75/04 (EP);
C08K5/521, C08L75/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STARREM POLYMERSCHAUM | [2018/03] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING RIGID POLYMER FOAM | [2018/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MOUSSE POLYMÈRE RIGIDE | [2018/03] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/02] | 24.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO2013127814 (BASF SE [DE]) [XD] 1-13 * claims 1,13-14; table 1 *; | [X]WO2013107573 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 21, lines 35-41; claims 1,9,17-18 * * page 19, lines 37-41 * * page 21, lines 27-31; table 1 *; | [X]EP2700669 (BASF SE [DE]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0026] - [0027] - [0029] , [0032] , [0034] - [0035] - [0041] , [0049] , [0054]; claim 1 *; | [A]US3637543 (KOENIG F [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, lines 15-25; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP0527613 | DE4202758 | JP2006137870 | WO2013127814 | - R. W., Hoffman in Synthesis, (20010000), vol. 2, pages 243 - 246 | - I. SCOTT, Tetrahedron Letters, (19860000), vol. 27, no. 11, pages 1251 - 1254 | - K. ONDER, Rubber Chemistry and Technology, vol. 59, pages 615 - 622 | - T. O., Ahn in Polymer, (19980000), vol. 39, no. 2, pages 459 - 456 |