EP3275371 - DROWSINESS DETECTION PROGRAM MEDIUM, DROWSINESS DETECTION METHOD, AND DROWSINESS DETECTION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Yasuhiko c/o FUJITSU TEN (EUROPE) GMBH Suedwestpark 23 90449 Nuernberg / DE | 02 /
Sano, Satoshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Senokuchi, Satoshi c/o FUJITSU KYUSHU NETWORK TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED 2-2-1 Momochihama Sawara-ku, Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka, 814-8588 / JP | 04 /
Kubota, Eiichiro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/05] | Application number, filing date | 17181158.1 | 13.07.2017 | [2018/05] | Priority number, date | JP20160150661 | 29.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016150661 | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3275371 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/18, // A61B5/024, A61B5/04, A61B5/0456 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
A61B5/18 (EP,US);
A61B5/024 (EP,US);
A61B5/347 (US);
A61B5/7275 (US);
A61B5/02405 (EP,US);
A61B5/316 (EP);
A61B5/352 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROGRAMMMEDIUM ZUR ERKENNUNG VON MÜDIGKEIT, MÜDIGKEITSERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON MÜDIGKEIT | [2018/05] | English: | DROWSINESS DETECTION PROGRAM MEDIUM, DROWSINESS DETECTION METHOD, AND DROWSINESS DETECTION APPARATUS | [2018/05] | French: | SUPPORT DE PROGRAMME DE DÉTECTION DE SOMNOLENCE, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE SOMNOLENCE, ET APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION DE SOMNOLENCE | [2018/05] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 06.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009275847 (KARASUDANI AYU [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0027] - [0059]; figures 1-6, *; | [A]US2013043886 (MASE ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,6* paragraphs [0004] - [0007] - [0013] - [0027] - [0073] , [0053] , [0099] - [0133]; figures 12,13,14,16 *; | [A]US2014378857 (MASUDA YUTA [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0036] - [0057]; figures 1-8,10 *; | [Y]US2015164358 (MOORMAN J RANDALL [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0039] - [0041] - [0087] - [0094] - [0109] *; | [A]US2016113538 (CHIU HUNG-CHIH [TW], et al) [A] 1,5,6 * paragraphs [0014] , [0018] , [0087]; figures 1-2; claim 1 *; | [A] - Milan Palus ET AL, "ENTROPIES, PARTITIONINGS AND HEART RATE VARIABILITY", Activitas Nervosa Superior, Prague, doi:10.1007/BF03380037, (20090601), pages 65 - 72, URL: https://rd.springer.com/article/10.1007%2FBF03380037, XP055231642 [A] 1,5,6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF03380037 | by applicant | JPH07108847 | JP2007289540 |