EP3272978 - DEVICE FOR BLOCKING CASINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cursale, Davide Via Quaglia 24 21020 Bardello (VA) / IT | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Ponzellini, Gian-Marco, et al PGA S.P.A., Milano Succursale di Lugano Viale Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/04] | Ponzellini, Gianmarco, et al PGA S.P.A., Milano Succursale di Lugano Viale Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 17181464.3 | 14.07.2017 | [2018/04] | Priority number, date | IT20160074998 | 18.07.2016 Original published format: IT201600074998 | [2018/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3272978 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E05C17/50 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
E05C17/50 (EP);
E05B63/006 (EP);
E05C19/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BLOCKIEREN VON FENSTERLÄDEN | [2018/04] | English: | DEVICE FOR BLOCKING CASINGS | [2018/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE DE VOLETS | [2018/04] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 04.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0823524 (ESINPLAST [IT]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2790030 (TORDO BELGRANO SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2845110 (TIRARD [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |