EP3431465 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING METHIONINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2019/50] |
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNHARDT, Sebastian Würzburgerstrasse 20 63739 Aschaffenburg / DE | 02 /
KÖRFER, Martin Mainstraße 20 63796 Kahl / DE | 03 /
REICHERT, Stefan Robert-Koch-Allee 26 60438 Frankfurt / DE | 04 /
HASSELBACH, Hans Joachim Deutschordenstr. 6 63571 Geinhausen / DE | 05 /
DRAPAL, Bernd Danziger Platz 1 63755 Alzenau / DE | 06 /
PETER, Rainer Frankenstr. 5a 63829 Krombach / DE | 07 /
KAISER, Christian Walburgstr. 3 63857 Waldaschaff / DE | 08 /
HARTONO, Benny 11 Balmeg Hill, 04-21 119916 Singapur / SG | 09 /
JAKOB, Harald Meerholzer Strasse 1 63594 Hasselroth / DE | [2019/13] |
Former [2019/04] | 01 /
BERNHARDT, Sebastian Würzburgerstrasse 20 63739 Aschaffenburg / DE | ||
02 /
KÖRFER, Martin Mainstraße 20 63796 Kahl / DE | |||
03 /
REICHERT, Stefan Robert-Koch-Allee 26 60438 Frankfurt / DE | |||
04 /
HASSELBACH, Hans Joachim Deutschordenstr. 6 63571 Geinhausen / DE | |||
05 /
DRAPAL, Bernd Danziger Platz 1 63755 Alzenau / DE | |||
06 /
PETER, Rainer Frankenstr. 5a 63829 Krombach / DE | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management PB 84/339 Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 17182515.1 | 21.07.2017 | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3431465 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3431465 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07C319/20, C07C319/28, C07C323/58 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
C07C319/20 (EP);
C07C319/28 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C319/20, C07C323/58 (EP);
C07C319/28, C07C323/58 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METHIONIN | [2019/04] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING METHIONINE | [2019/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE MÉTHIONINE | [2019/04] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/02] | 08.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2016170252 (ADISSEO FRANCE SAS [FR]) [AD] 1-9 * page 5 - page 6; examples 1-3 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US4391988 (SPINDLER MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 2 - column 3; examples 1-4 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0839804 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP2133328 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4259525 (SCHAAF KURT H) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US4272631 (SCHAAF KURT H, et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [AD] - MITCHELL C C ET AL, "Evaluation of a liquid potassium bicarbonate/amino acid co-product as a source of potassium, nitrogen, and sulfur", JOURNAL OF PLANT NUTRI, MARCEL DEKKER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19941101), vol. 17, no. 12, doi:10.1080/01904169409364869, ISSN 0190-4167, pages 2119 - 2134, XP008125142 [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/01904169409364869 | [AD] - G. V. SUBBARAO ET AL, "Sodium-A Functional Plant Nutrient", CRITICAL REVIEWS IN PLANT SCIENCES., US, (20030901), vol. 22, no. 5, doi:10.1080/07352680390243495, ISSN 0735-2689, pages 391 - 416, XP055413499 [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/07352680390243495 | by applicant | US5770769 | WO2013030068 | EP1564208 | WO2016170252 | - C.C. MITCHEL; A.E. HILTBOLD, Journal of Plant Nutrition, (19940000), vol. 17, no. 12, pages 2119 - 2134 | - SUBBARAO et al., Critical Reviews in Plant Sciences, (20030000), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 391 - 416 | - GMELIN, Gmelins Handbuch, (19380000), vol. 22 | - TAKAHASHI, G., Bull. Imp. Seric. Stn., (19270000), vol. 29, page 165 | - TRYPUC, M.; KIELKOWSKA, U., J. Chem. Eng. Data, (19980000), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 201 - 204 | - FEDOTEV, P. P., Z. Phys. Chem., (19040000), vol. 49, page 168 | - FUCHS et al., Ind. Eng. Chem. Res., (20060000), vol. 45, pages 6578 - 6584 |