EP3276190 - A BEARING ARRANGEMENT WITH SENSOR AND AN ASSOCIATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minebea Mitsumi Inc. 4106-73, Oaza Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano 3890293 / JP | For all designated states New Hampshire Ball Bearing Inc. 175 Jaffrey Road Peterborough, NH 03458 / US | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINKER, Martin PM DM Auf Herdenen 10 78052 Villingen Schwenningen / DE | 02 /
BAUER, Martin PM DM Auf Herdenen 10 78052 Villingen Schwenningen / DE | 03 /
CARBONETTI, Andrea Paradox Engineering Via Passeggiata 7 CH-6883 Novazzano / CH | 04 /
HÜLSEN, Tobias NHBB (Europe) c/o NMB Minebea GmbH Siemensstrasse 30 63225 Langen / DE | 05 /
CALABRÒ, Gaetano Paradox Engineering Via Passeggiata 7 CH-6883 Novazzano / CH | 06 /
BHATTI, Mohammed NMB-Minebea UK Ltd 2 Sadler Road Lincoln, Lincolnshire LN6 3RA / GB | 07 /
LEWIS, Brandyn Astro Division 155 Lexington Drive Laconia, NH NH03246 / US | 08 /
RAY, Dick Astro Division 155 Lexington Drive Laconia, NH 03246 / US | 09 /
OGAWA, Satoshi NHBB (Europe) c/o NMB Minebea GmbH Siemensstrasse 30 63225 Langen / DE | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Harding, Andrew Philip Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2018/05] | Application number, filing date | 17182816.3 | 24.07.2017 | [2018/05] | Priority number, date | US201615223440 | 29.07.2016 Original published format: US201615223440 | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3276190 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16C11/06, F16C17/24 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
F16C11/0647 (EP,US);
G01M13/04 (US);
F16C11/06 (US);
F16C17/246 (EP,US);
F16C41/008 (US);
G01B7/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAGERANORDNUNG MIT SENSOR UND EIN KORRESPONDIERENDES VERFAHREN | [2018/05] | English: | A BEARING ARRANGEMENT WITH SENSOR AND AN ASSOCIATED METHOD | [2018/05] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE PALIER COMPRENANT UN CAPTEUR ET MÉTHODE ASSOCIÉE | [2018/05] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 10.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2120738 (SKF KUGELLAGERFABRIKEN GMBH) [X] 1,7,12 * page 1, line 90 - page 2, line 79; figure - * [Y] 8,9,11; | [XY]GB2192949 (WICKERS SHIPBUILDING & ENGINEE) [X] 1,2,4-6,12 * page 1, line 100 - line 129 * * page 2, line 124 - page 3, line 30 * * page 3, line 71 - line 104; figures 4, 6, 9 * [Y] 8,9; | [YD]WO03029065 (MINEBEA CO LTD [JP], et al) [YD] 8,9,11,15 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2009223083 (LECRONE TIMOTHY J [US]) [X] 1-4,12 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0044]; figure - * [Y] 8,9; | [XY]US2015176638 (HEBRARD YOANN [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract *[Y] 8,9,11; | [XYI]EP3045749 (MAHLE ENGINE SYSTEMS UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,12 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0068]; figures 1A-3B, 5A, 5B, 8A, 8B * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059] * [Y] 8,9,11,15 [I] 13,14 | by applicant | WO03029065 |