EP3276200 - HYDRAULIC ANTI-VIBRATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2, Rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEMAIRE, Gabriel 2 rue des Tilleuls 28200 Saint-Denis-les-Ponts / FR | 02 /
BELLAMY, Alain 7 Rue du Bourg 41310 AMBLOY / FR | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/05] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 17182840.3 | 24.07.2017 | [2018/05] | Priority number, date | FR20160057189 | 26.07.2016 Original published format: FR 1657189 | [2018/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3276200 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3276200 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/26 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
F16F13/264 (EP,CN,US);
F16F15/005 (KR);
F16F13/105 (CN);
F16F13/10 (US);
F16F13/14 (KR);
F16F9/3207 (CN);
H02K7/1823 (KR);
F16F2228/066 (US);
F16F2230/18 (US);
Y02E10/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] |
Former [2018/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2018/05] | English: | HYDRAULIC ANTI-VIBRATION DEVICE | [2018/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTIVIBRATOIRE HYDRAULIQUE | [2018/05] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 03.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.07.2017 | AL | 06.02.2019 | AT | 06.02.2019 | CY | 06.02.2019 | CZ | 06.02.2019 | DK | 06.02.2019 | EE | 06.02.2019 | ES | 06.02.2019 | FI | 06.02.2019 | HR | 06.02.2019 | IT | 06.02.2019 | LT | 06.02.2019 | LV | 06.02.2019 | MC | 06.02.2019 | MK | 06.02.2019 | MT | 06.02.2019 | NL | 06.02.2019 | PL | 06.02.2019 | RO | 06.02.2019 | RS | 06.02.2019 | SE | 06.02.2019 | SI | 06.02.2019 | SK | 06.02.2019 | SM | 06.02.2019 | TR | 06.02.2019 | BG | 06.05.2019 | NO | 06.05.2019 | GR | 07.05.2019 | IS | 06.06.2019 | PT | 06.06.2019 | IE | 24.07.2019 | LU | 24.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 24.07.2017 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 24.07.2019 | ||
LU | 24.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.07.2017 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 24.07.2019 | ||
LU | 24.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 24.07.2019 | ||
LU | 24.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 24.07.2019 | ||
LU | 24.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 24.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 06.02.2019 | |
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 06.02.2019 | |
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5792948 (AOKI KAZUSHIGE [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE102010060885 (CONTITECH VIBRATION CONTROL [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]WO2015136160 (HUTCHINSON [FR]) [AD] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]DE102014211954 (CONTITECH VIBRATION CONTROL [DE]) [A] 1* abstract * |