EP3279051 - CONTROL SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD FOR SELECTING AND TRACKING A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lucas Automotive GmbH Carl-Spaeter Strasse 8 56070 Koblenz / DE | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oska, Bjoern Anton-Reuter-Strasse 8a 56070 Koblenz / DE | 02 /
Altendorfer, Richard Am Turnerheim 16 56070 Koblenz / DE | 03 /
Ledovskich, Daniel Wilhelmstrasse 63 56626 Andernach / DE | 04 /
Schwarz, Christian Werkelslay 11 56727 Mayen / DE | 05 /
Jöbgen, Benedikt Rosenstrasse 17 53489 Sinzig-Bad Bodendorf / DE | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2024/08] |
Former [2018/06] | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17182901.3 | 25.07.2017 | [2018/06] | Priority number, date | DE20161009302 | 01.08.2016 Original published format: DE102016009302 | [2018/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3279051 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3279051 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/165, B60W30/095, B60W10/04, B60W10/18, B60W10/20, B60W50/08, B60W50/10, B60W30/16, B60K31/00 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
B60W50/087 (EP,US);
B60W30/16 (EP,CN,US);
B60K31/0008 (EP,US);
B60W10/04 (EP,US);
B60W10/18 (EP,US);
B60W30/0953 (EP,US);
B60W30/0956 (EP,US);
B60W40/04 (CN);
B60W50/10 (EP,CN,US);
G01S17/931 (US);
G05D1/0011 (US);
G05D1/0268 (US);
G05D1/027 (US);
B60K2031/0016 (EP,US);
B60W2520/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2018/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STEUERUNGS-SYSTEM UND STEUERUNGS-VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL UND VERFOLGUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2018/06] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD FOR SELECTING AND TRACKING A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2018/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DESTINÉ À SÉLECTIONNER ET À SUIVRE UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2018/06] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 03.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 21.02.2024 | ES | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | SE | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
LV | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
PL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
PT | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1315980 (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [X] 1,3,7,9 * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0010] - [0014] - [ 0019] , [0054] - [0055] - [0058] , [0088] * [Y] 5,6,11,12 [I] 2,8; | [XI]EP1977947 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,10 * claim 1 * * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0005] - [0006] - [0021] - [0027] - [0030] , [0043] - [0054] * [I] 2,5,6,8,11,12; | [Y]DE102012210145 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 5,6,11,12 * paragraphs [0047] , [0057] *; | [A]US2015100217 (SUDOU TAKUMA [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document * | Examination | DE102010023196 |