EP3279533 - A CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A PRESSURISED GAS PATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde GmbH Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2020/25] |
Former [2018/06] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COWLES, Christopher John 49 Parkstead Road London SW15 5AN / GB | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2018/06] | Christie, Gemma Louise The Linde Group Intellectual Property 10 Priestley Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 7XY / GB | Application number, filing date | 17184061.4 | 31.07.2017 | [2018/06] | Priority number, date | GB20160013242 | 01.08.2016 Original published format: GB 201613242 | [2018/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3279533 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/00, F17C13/04 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
F17C13/04 (EP,GB);
F17C2205/0323 (EP);
F17C2205/0329 (GB);
F17C2205/0338 (EP,GB);
F17C2205/035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] |
Former [2018/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN PFAD EINES DRUCKBEAUFSCHLAGTEN GASES | [2018/06] | English: | A CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A PRESSURISED GAS PATH | [2018/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE POUR TRAJET DE GAZ SOUS PRESSION | [2018/06] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 15.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 15.11.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 15.11.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3053498 (DUMM ROBERT P) [X] 1,2,4,6 * figures 1-4 * * column 1, line 8 - column 3, line 28 * [A] 3,5,7-9; | [XA]US6328280 (DAVIDSON GILBERT [US]) [X] 1,3,9 * figures 1-10 * * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 36 * * column 3, line 22 - column 5, line 55 * [A] 2,4-8; | [XA]US7584936 (LEWIS JEFF [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 5 - column 1, line 21 * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, lines 55-67 * * column 5, lines 5-21 * * column 6, lines 50-59 * [A] 2-4,6,9; | [X]WO8503754 (WILLIAMS WILLIAM J, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US6681949 (TIBOR KENNETH R [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US8262059 (DOLENTI WILLIAM T [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2608377 (WALTER STREUN) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5295907 (AKKERMAN NEIL H [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]USH636H (THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AS REPRESENTED BY DEPT. OF ENERGY) [X] 1 * the whole document * |