EP3275828 - MONITORING OF STEP ROLLERS AND MAINTENANCE MECHANICS OF PASSENGER CONVEYORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company One Carrier Place Farmington CT 06032 / US | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhaoxia, Hu Nr 28 JiuHuan road Jianggan District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310019 / CN | 02 /
JianGuo, Li Nr 28 JiuHuan road Jianggan District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310019 / CN | 03 /
Alois, Senger Unteramt 171 AT/3264 Gresten / AT | 04 /
Hui, Fang Room 3502, 35/F, Kerry Parkside Office 1155 Fang Dian Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201204 / CN | 05 /
Zhen, Jia Room 3502, 35/F, Kerry Parkside Office 1155 Fang Dian Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201204 / CN | 06 /
Jianwei, Zhao Nr 3239 Shenjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 200001 / CN | 07 /
Qiang, Li Nr 3239 Shenjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 200001 / CN | 08 /
Anna, Suz Room 502, Changxing Building Nr 888 BiBo Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | 09 /
Alan Matthew, Finn 411 Silver Lane East Hartford Connecticut 06108 / US | 10 /
Wei, Ge Nr 28 JiuHuan Road Hangzhou Zheijiang 310019 / CN | 11 /
Yanying, Chen Nr 163 Xinhua Yi Road Guangzhou 510425 / CN | 12 /
Longwen, Wang Nr 3239 Shenjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 200001 / CN | 13 /
DuEon, Kim Nr 3239 Shenjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 200001 / CN | [2018/17] |
Former [2018/05] | 01 /
Zhaoxia, Hu Nr 28 JiuHuan road Jianggan District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310019 / CN | ||
02 /
JianGuo, Li Nr 28 JiuHuan road Jianggan District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310019 / CN | |||
03 /
Alois, Senger businesspark Marximum Modecenter Str. 17/Building 1 1110 Vienna / AT | |||
04 /
Hui, Fang Room 3502, 35/F, Kerry Parkside Office 1155 Fang Dian Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201204 / CN | |||
05 /
Zhen, Jia Room 3502, 35/F, Kerry Parkside Office 1155 Fang Dian Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201204 / CN | |||
06 /
Jianwei, Zhao Nr 3239 Shenjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 200001 / CN | |||
07 /
Qiang, Li Nr 3239 Shenjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 200001 / CN | |||
08 /
Anna, Suz Room 502, Changxing Building Nr 888 BiBo Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
09 /
Alan Matthew, Finn 411 Silver Lane East Hartford Connecticut 06108 / US | |||
10 /
Wei, Ge Nr 28 JiuHuan Road Hangzhou Zheijiang 310019 / CN | |||
11 /
Yanying, Chen Nr 163 Xinhua Yi Road Guangzhou 510425 / CN | |||
12 /
Longwen, Wang Nr 3239 Shenjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 200001 / CN | |||
13 /
DuEon, Kim Nr 3239 Shenjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 200001 / CN | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/08] |
Former [2018/05] | Gardiner, Stephen Robin Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17184126.5 | 31.07.2017 | [2018/05] | Priority number, date | CN201610609990 | 29.07.2016 Original published format: CN201610609990 | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3275828 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3275828 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B66B25/00, B66B29/00 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
B66B25/006 (EP,CN,US);
B66B21/02 (US);
B66B23/145 (US);
B66B25/003 (US);
B66B29/005 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/05] | B66B29/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] |
Former [2018/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNG VON STUFENROLLEN UND WARTUNGSMECHANISMEN VON PERSONENFÖRDERANLAGEN | [2018/05] | English: | MONITORING OF STEP ROLLERS AND MAINTENANCE MECHANICS OF PASSENGER CONVEYORS | [2018/05] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DE GALETS ET ENTRETIEN DE LA MÉCANIQUE DE TAPIS ROULANTS | [2018/05] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 03.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2017 | AL | 19.02.2020 | AT | 19.02.2020 | CY | 19.02.2020 | CZ | 19.02.2020 | DK | 19.02.2020 | EE | 19.02.2020 | ES | 19.02.2020 | FI | 19.02.2020 | HR | 19.02.2020 | IT | 19.02.2020 | LT | 19.02.2020 | LV | 19.02.2020 | MC | 19.02.2020 | MK | 19.02.2020 | MT | 19.02.2020 | NL | 19.02.2020 | PL | 19.02.2020 | RO | 19.02.2020 | RS | 19.02.2020 | SE | 19.02.2020 | SI | 19.02.2020 | SK | 19.02.2020 | SM | 19.02.2020 | TR | 19.02.2020 | BG | 19.05.2020 | NO | 19.05.2020 | GR | 20.05.2020 | IS | 19.06.2020 | PT | 12.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | IE | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | LU | 31.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 31.07.2017 | |
AL | 19.02.2020 | ||
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
IE | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
LU | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 31.07.2017 | |
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
IE | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
LU | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
IE | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
LU | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
LU | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
LU | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
NO | 19.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7225912 (TOENNISSON H EUGENE [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]JP2010265078 (MITSUBISHI ELEC BUILDING TECHN, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XA]JP2012180187 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR CO LTD) [X] 1,12,14 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015]; figures 1-5 * [A] 2-11,15 |