EP3300607 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A FOAMABLE MILK COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/14] | FOAMABLE MILK COMPOSITION | ||
[2023/48] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DMK Deutsches Milchkontor GmbH Industriestraße 27 27404 Zeven / DE | [2018/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bode, Katja Lange Straße 6 21279 Hollenstedt / DE | 02 /
Cervantes Sanvicente, Paola Steinweg 15a 28832 Achim / DE | [2023/16] |
Former [2019/06] | 01 /
Borcherding, Katja Lange Straße 6 21279 Hollenstedt / DE | ||
02 /
Cervantes Sanvicente, Paola Steinweg 15a 28832 Achim / DE | |||
Former [2018/14] | 01 /
Borcherding, Katja Lange Straße 8 21279 Hollenstedt / DE | ||
02 /
Cervantes Sanvicente, Paola Steinweg 15a 28832 Achim / DE | Representative(s) | Fabry, Bernd IP2 Patentanwalts GmbH Schlossstrasse 523 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2018/14] | Application number, filing date | 17184233.9 | 01.08.2017 | [2018/14] | Priority number, date | EP20160191066 | 28.09.2016 Original published format: EP 16191066 | DE201620107358U | 23.12.2016 Original published format: DE 202016107358 U | [2018/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3300607 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3300607 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/142, A23C21/00, A23J3/08, A23P30/40, A23C9/13, A23C9/152, A23C13/14, A23C21/06 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
A23C9/142 (EP,US);
A23C7/00 (CN);
A23C9/152 (US);
A23C13/14 (EP,US);
A23C21/00 (EP,US);
A23C21/06 (EP,US);
A23C9/1307 (EP,US);
A23C9/1422 (EP,US);
A23C9/148 (US);
A23C9/1524 (EP,US);
A23C9/1526 (EP,US);
A23J3/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/14] | A23C9/142, A23C21/00, A23J3/08, A23P30/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] |
Former [2018/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER AUFSCHÄUMBAREN MILCHZUBEREITUNG | [2023/48] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A FOAMABLE MILK COMPOSITION | [2023/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE LAIT MOUSSABLE | [2023/48] |
Former [2018/14] | AUFSCHÄUMBARE MILCHZUBEREITUNG | ||
Former [2018/14] | FOAMABLE MILK COMPOSITION | ||
Former [2018/14] | COMPOSITION DU LAIT EXPANSIBLE | Examination procedure | 01.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 17.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.11.2023 | 13.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006034856 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [I] 1,3,14 * page 5, lines 1-2; claims 1,9,10,11,14 * * page 4, lines 26-33 *; | [XI] - "HOW INGREDIENTS HELP SOLVE BEVERAGE PROBLEMS", FOOD TECHNOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF FOOD TECHNOLOGISTS, CHICAGO, IL, US, (200110), vol. 55, no. 10, ISSN 0015-6639, page 74,76, XP001108331 [X] 1,2,5,6,12,13,15 * zweite Seite des Dokuments, mittlere Spalte, 4ter Absatz * [I] 1-15 | [XI] - KAMMERLEHNER J, "SIMPLESSE 100 - DRY SIMPLESSE 100. \SPEZIFISCHE PRODUKTE AUS MOLKE ZUR AUFWERTUNG VON LEBENSMITTELN", DMZ. LEBENSMITTELINDUSTRIE UND MILCHWISSENSCHAFT, VOLKSWIRTSCHAFTLICHER VERLAG GMBH. MUNCHEN, DE, (19930715), vol. 114, no. 29, ISSN 0938-9369, pages 848 - 850,852, XP000381847 [X] 1,2,6,12,13 * page 848, column 1, line 5 * * Absatz in der Mitte der Spalte; page 850, column 1 * [I] 1,2,6,12,13 | [I] - TOSI ET AL, "Foaming properties of sweet whey solutions as modified by thermal treatment", FOOD CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER LTD, NL, (20070101), vol. 100, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.FOODCHEM.2005.11.001, ISSN 0308-8146, pages 794 - 799, XP005518718 [I] 9 * figures 1,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodchem.2005.11.001 | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "Airy plants.", FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANkFURT-MAIN, DE, (2005), Database accession no. FS-2005-10-Gg0860, XP002774931 [Y] 7 * abstract * | Examination | US5935632 | WO0048473 | WO2016128623 | by applicant | DE102012100495 | EP2658420 | EP2725098 | EP2887814 | WO2016126810 |