EP3439438 - NON-UNIFORM MAGNETIC FOIL EMBEDDED IN COMPONENT CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT & S Austria Technologie & Systemtechnik Aktiengesellschaft Fabriksgasse 13 8700 Leoben-Hinterberg / AT | [2024/41] |
Former [2019/06] | For all designated states AT & S Austria Technologie & Systemtechnik Aktiengesellschaft Fabriksgasse 13 8700 Leoben-Hinterberg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIDINGER, Gerald Pebalstrasse 35a 8700 Leoben / AT | 02 /
SILVANO DE SOUSA, Jonathan Columbusgasse 73/7 1100 Wien / AT | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Donatello, Daniele AT&S - Austria Technologie & Systemtechnik AG Fabrikgasse 13 8700 Leoben / AT | [2024/41] |
Former [2019/06] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstrasse 58 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17184547.2 | 02.08.2017 | [2019/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3439438 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3439438 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/02 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
H05K1/0233 (EP,US);
H05K1/0298 (CN);
H01L23/49822 (CN);
H01L23/552 (CN);
H05K1/0213 (CN);
H05K1/0224 (EP,US);
H05K1/188 (US);
H05K3/4658 (US);
H05K1/0225 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] |
Former [2019/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UNGLEICHMÄSSIGE, IN EINEM BAUTEILTRÄGER EINGEBETTETE MAGNETISCHE FOLIE | [2019/06] | English: | NON-UNIFORM MAGNETIC FOIL EMBEDDED IN COMPONENT CARRIER | [2019/06] | French: | FEUILLE MAGNÉTIQUE NON UNIFORME INCORPORÉ DANS UNE PORTEUSE DE COMPOSANT | [2019/06] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 02.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]EP0785557 (TOKIN CORP [JP]); | [XI]US5966294 (HARADA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [A]DE10162637 (EUPEC GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [Y]US2014209691 (FINN DAVID [IE], et al) |