EP3437668 - CANNULA FOR INTRAVASCULAR BLOOD PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abiomed Europe GmbH Neuenhofer Weg 3 52074 Aachen / DE | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABOULHOSN, Walid c/o Abiomed Europe GmbH Neuenhofer Weg 3 52074 Aachen / DE | 02 /
SIESS, Thorsten c/o Abiomed Europe GmbH Neuenhofer Weg 3 52074 Aachen / DE | 03 /
KIRCHHOFF, Frank c/o Abiomed Europe GmbH Neuenhofer Weg 3 52074 Aachen / DE | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2019/06] | Application number, filing date | 17184552.2 | 02.08.2017 | [2019/06] | Priority number, date | EP20170177180 | 21.06.2017 Original published format: EP 17177180 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3437668 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3437668 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/10, A61M1/12 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
A61M60/857 (EP,KR,US);
A61M60/178 (KR,US);
A61M25/0009 (KR);
A61M25/0012 (US);
A61M25/0054 (KR);
A61M60/13 (EP,US);
A61M60/148 (KR);
A61M60/174 (US);
A61M60/216 (EP,KR,US);
B29C41/04 (KR);
B29C41/34 (KR);
B29D23/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] |
Former [2019/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KANÜLE FÜR INTRAVASKULÄRE BLUTPUMPE | [2019/06] | English: | CANNULA FOR INTRAVASCULAR BLOOD PUMP | [2019/06] | French: | CANULE POUR POMPE À SANG INTRAVASCULAIRE | [2019/06] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 10.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2012172655 (CAMPBELL ROBERT L [US], et al); | [XA]US2014012065 (FITZGERALD KEIF M [US], et al); | [A]US2015328382 (CORBETT SCOTT C [US], et al); | [A]US2016279310 (SCHECKEL MARIO [DE], et al) |