EP3269756 - TEMPERATURE-RESISTANT SILICONE RESINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2024/37] |
Former [2023/12] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | ||
Former [2018/03] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Chaoyin 16011 Crosswind Ave. CHINO, CA, 91708 / US | 02 /
NOWAK, Andrew P. 1525 S. Saltair Ave. 108 LOS ANGELES, CA, 90025 / US | 03 /
SHARP, Richard E. 5980 Mergenthal Court WELDON SPRING, MO, 63304 / US | 04 /
LI, Wen 15460 Laguna Canyon Road IRVINE, CA, 92618 / US | 05 /
FRENCH, James E. 1719 Big Hom Basin Drive BALLWIN, MO, 63011 / US | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [2024/37] |
Former [2018/03] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 17184941.7 | 25.06.2015 | [2018/03] | Priority number, date | US201414329884 | 11.07.2014 Original published format: US201414329884 | [2018/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3269756 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3269756 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/16 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
C08G77/52 (EP,US);
C08G77/04 (US);
C08G77/42 (EP,US);
C08G77/44 (EP,US);
C08G77/442 (US);
C08G77/48 (EP,US);
C08G77/56 (EP,US);
C08G77/58 (EP,US);
C08G77/80 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K5/54 (EP,US);
C08K5/5415 (US);
C08K5/57 (EP,US);
C08L83/10 (EP,US);
C08L83/14 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L83/10 (US,EP);
C08K3/22, C08L83/14 (EP,US);
C08K5/54, C08L83/10 (US,EP);
C08K5/54, C08L83/14 (US,EP);
C08K5/57, C08L83/10 (US,EP);
C08L83/10, C08K3/22 (US);
C08L83/10, C08K5/54 (US);
C08L83/10, C08K5/57 (US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] |
Former [2018/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TEMPERATURBESTÄNDIGE SILIKONHARZE | [2018/03] | English: | TEMPERATURE-RESISTANT SILICONE RESINS | [2018/03] | French: | RÉSINES DE SILICONE RÉSISTANTE À LA TEMPÉRATURE | [2018/03] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 03.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15173795.4 / EP2966115 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3541044 (BEERS MELVIN D, et al); | [A]GB1223717 (GNII KHIM T ELEMENTO ORGAN [RU], et al); | [XY]EP0992560 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]); | [XY]US2009076217 (GOMMANS LOUIE H [NZ], et al); | [XA]JP2011190413 (UNIV KUMAMOTO, et al) |