EP3441258 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ATTACHING A FINISHING ELEMENT TO A FIBER CUSHION, AND RESULTING FIBER CUSHION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schukra Gerätebau GmbH Leobersdorfer Str. 26 2560 Berndorf / AT | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖNCZÖL, Georg Rautenweg 167/136 1220 Wien / AT | 02 /
KRISTO, Darko Geymüllerstr. 2 2540 Bad Vöslau / AT | 03 /
SEEN, Gunnar Buchengasse 169/Top 14 1100 Wien / AT | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 17185249.4 | 08.08.2017 | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3441258 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/70, C08F2/00, B29C35/04, B29C70/26, B29C65/00, D04H3/08 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
B60N2/7017 (EP);
B60N2/7094 (EP);
B29C65/04 (EP);
B29C65/08 (EP);
B29C65/1412 (EP);
B29C65/16 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/5326 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/7294 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/00 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2077/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES ENDBEARBEITUNGSELEMENTS AN EINEM FASERKISSEN UND DARAUS RESULTIERENDES FASERKISSEN | [2019/07] | English: | METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ATTACHING A FINISHING ELEMENT TO A FIBER CUSHION, AND RESULTING FIBER CUSHION | [2019/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS PERMETTANT DE FIXER UN ÉLÉMENT DE FINITION POUR UN COUSSIN DE FIBRES, ET FIBRES OBTENUES COUSSIN | [2019/07] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/03] | 28.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US6077378 (BULLARD LARRY I [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-11,13-15 * column 5, lines 8-30; figure 7 * [A] 3 [I] 12; | [XAI]EP2532502 (SCHUKRA GERAETEBAU GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,2,4-11,13-15 * paragraphs [[0005]] , [ [0021]] - [[0023]] - [ [0043]] - [[0045]] - [ [0082]]; figures 3,4 * [A] 3 [I] 12; | [XAI]US2007001336 (NISHIBORI SADAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-11,13-15 * paragraph [0014]; figure 16 * [A] 3 [I] 12; | [XAI]JPH0556829 (TOYO KUTSUSHIYON KK) [X] 1,2,4-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] * [A] 3 [I] 12 | by applicant | EP2417876 |