EP3285155 - ORGANIC HAPTIC INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states fm marketing gmbh Schalkham 77 5202 Neumarkt am Wallersee / AT | [2023/41] |
Former [2018/08] | For all designated states fm marketing gmbh Schalkham 77 5202 Neumarkt am Wallersee / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, THOMAS Weissbachstraße 10 83457 Bayerisch Gmain / DE | 02 /
Maier, Ferdinand Schalkham 77 5202 Neumarkt am Wallersee / AT | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | von Bülow & Tamada Rotbuchenstraße 6 81547 München / DE | [2018/08] | Application number, filing date | 17186107.3 | 14.08.2017 | [2018/08] | Priority number, date | DE201610115210 | 16.08.2016 Original published format: DE102016115210 | [2018/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3285155 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3285155 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0482, G06F3/0338, G06F3/038, G06F3/04892, H04N5/445, H04N21/422, H04N21/47 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
G06F3/038 (EP,US);
G06F3/0338 (EP,US);
G06F3/0383 (US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06F3/0488 (US);
G06F3/04892 (EP,US);
G06F9/4416 (US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/08] | G06F3/0482, G06F3/0338, H04N5/445, H04N21/422 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] |
Former [2018/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ORGANIC HAPTIC INTERFACE | [2018/08] | English: | ORGANIC HAPTIC INTERFACE | [2018/08] | French: | INTERFACE HAPTIQUE ORGANIQUE | [2018/08] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 12.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 23.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.12.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US7696980 (PIOT JULIEN [CH], et al) [I] 1-10 * column 2, line 41 - line 67; figures 5,6; claim - * * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 2 * * column 10, line 34 - column 11, line 67 ** column 22, line 6 - line 15 *; | [I]WO2015100154 (ROVI GUIDES INC [US]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0007] , [0018] , [0019] , [0027] , [0038] , [0044] , [0061]; figures 1,2,5; claim - * | Examination | US6128006 | US2007002018 | US2009140985 | by applicant | EP2568369 |