EP3284426 - STABILIZATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Globus Medical, Inc. Valley Forge Business Center 2560 General Armistead Avenue Audubon, PA 19403 / US | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANGDALE, Evan 682 West Johnson Street Philadelphia, PA 19444 / US | 02 /
RUTLEDGE, Henry 609 Derstine Avenue Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | 03 /
GAULT, James A. 2225 Pemberton Street Philadelphia, PA 19146 / US | 04 /
DAVISON, Andrew 567 Westwood Drive Downingtown, PA 19335 / US | 05 /
DAVIS, Barclay 273 Deerhaven Road Glenmoore, PA 19343-8922 / US | 06 /
GAHMAN, Kevin 101 Balsam drive Douglassville, PA 19518 / US | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | Morabito, Sara, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | [2018/08] | Application number, filing date | 17186514.0 | 16.08.2017 | [2018/08] | Priority number, date | US201615238772 | 17.08.2016 Original published format: US201615238772 | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3284426 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3284426 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/80 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
A61B17/8014 (EP,US);
A61B17/8042 (EP,US);
A61B17/1728 (US);
A61B17/7059 (EP,US);
A61B17/8052 (EP,US);
A61B17/8057 (EP,US);
A61B17/8061 (US);
A61B17/86 (US);
A61B17/8605 (EP,US);
A61B17/8047 (US);
A61B17/808 (US);
A61B17/809 (US);
A61B2017/00858 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] |
Former [2018/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STABILISIERUNGSSYSTEME | [2018/08] | English: | STABILIZATION SYSTEMS | [2018/08] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE STABILISATION | [2018/08] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 24.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005187553 (GRABOWSKI JOHN J [US], et al) [Y] 10* paragraphs [0062] - [0067]; figures 12,13,20 *; | [XI]US2007043366 (PFEFFERLE JOACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,10,13,14 * paragraphs [0086] - [0091]; figures 10,11,28-32 * [I] 6; | [XI]DE102010025702 (AAP IMPLANTATE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,11 * the whole document * [I] 9,13,14; | [X]US2012136396 (BAKER CHARLES R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,13,14 * paragraphs [0054] - [0061]; figures 19-22,25-33 *; | [XYI]US8574268 (CHAN JASON S [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,12-15 * column 9, lines 18-65; figures 11,24,29,36 * * column 14, line 48 - column 15, line 19 * [Y] 10 [I] 6,9 | Examination | US5053036 | US5702396 | US2016045237 |