EP3327464 - ALGORITHM AND INFRASTRUCTURE FOR ROBUST AND EFFICIENT VEHICLE LOCALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baidu USA LLC 1195 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Quan 1195 Bordeaux Dr. Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 02 /
Zhai, Jing 1195 Bordeaux Dr. Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 17186657.7 | 17.08.2017 | [2018/22] | Priority number, date | US201615360882 | 23.11.2016 Original published format: US201615360882 | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3327464 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3327464 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/02, G01S17/06, G01S7/48, G01S13/86 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
G01S7/4808 (EP,US);
G05D1/0236 (CN);
G05D1/0274 (US);
G01C21/30 (US);
G01C21/3848 (EP,CN,US);
G01C21/3881 (EP,CN,US);
G01S13/86 (EP,US);
G01S17/06 (EP,US);
G01S17/86 (EP,US);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G05D1/0214 (CN);
G05D1/024 (CN);
G05D1/0242 (CN);
G05D1/0248 (CN);
G05D1/0255 (CN);
G05D1/0257 (CN);
G05D1/0259 (CN);
G05D1/0278 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | ALGORITHMUS UND INFRASTRUKTUR FÜR ROBUSTE UND EFFIZIENTE FAHRZEUGLOKALISIERUNG | [2018/22] | English: | ALGORITHM AND INFRASTRUCTURE FOR ROBUST AND EFFICIENT VEHICLE LOCALIZATION | [2018/22] | French: | ALGORITHME ET INFRASTRUCTURE POUR LOCALISATION ROBUSTE ET EFFICACE D'UN VÉHICULE | [2018/22] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 17.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.08.2017 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | ES | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | IT | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | TR | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IE | 17.08.2020 | LU | 17.08.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.08.2017 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IE | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 17.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IE | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 17.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 17.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 17.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 17.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US8885151 (CHATHAM ANDREW HUGHES [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 20 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 26 * * column 5, line 51 - column 11, line 58 *; | [A]US2016114804 (KOJIMA SHINYA [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]CN106023210 (BAIDU ONLINE NETWORK TECHNOLOGY BEIJING CO LTD ) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0095]; figure 4 * |